This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2022 at 07:25:59 (UTC).

Gabaldon v. Correct Care Solutions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2022 Gabaldon filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Correct Care Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise J. Casper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10822

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Gabaldon

Tucson, AZ 85734

Defendants

Correct Care Solutions, LLC

Lori Stanovich

Tiana A Bennett

Alden B. Cowen

Carol A. Mici

Department of Corrections

Jeffrey Souza

Raymond Harvey

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Transfer and Change of Address by Frank Gabaldon (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #12

Exhibit j

2 #11

Exhibit I

2 #10

Exhibit H

2 #9

Exhibit G

2 #8

Exhibit F

2 #7

Exhibit E

2 #6

Exhibit D

2 #5

Exhibit C

2 #4

Exhibit B

2 #3

Exhibit A

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

category form

2 #2

Main Document

1 #12

Exhibit j

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Transfer and Change of Address by Frank Gabaldon (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docket(#5) Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction/ Deleted : entry #2 because: Clerical error (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frank Gabaldon.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 05/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frank Gabaldon. (Attachments: #1 category form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit j)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 05/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant