This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2020 at 08:53:47 (UTC).

J.S.G. v. Stirrup et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 J S G filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Stirrup. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01026

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

J. S. G.

Respondents

Acting Director for Matthew ALBENCE

Deputy Director Kenneth Tota

Field Office Juvenil Adam Tierney

President, CEO Laurie Anne Spagnola

Alex M Azar, II

Acting Director Heidi Stirrup

CHAD F. WOLF

Francisco Madrigal

FFS Hildamaria Powell

Assistant Secretary Lynn Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Claudia R. Cubas

Attorney at Capital Area Immigrants Rights (CAIR) Coalition

1612 K Street Nw, Suite 204

Washington, DC 20006

Samantha Hsieh

Attorney at Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition

1612 K St. Nw Ste. 204

Washington, DC 20006

Respondent Attorneys

Vickie LeDuc

Attorney at US Attorney Office

36 S Charles St Fourth Floor

Baltimore, MD 21201

Kimberly Phillips

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Maryland

36 S. Charles St. 4Th Fl

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#26

#33

RESTRICTED

#32

RESTRICTED

#31

#29

#28

RESTRICTED

#27

#25

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) PAPERLESS ORDER approving #33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by J. S. G.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/1/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by J. S. G. (Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STATUS REPORT re: ECF No. 31 Letter Order by Heidi Stirrup(Phillips, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER Denying #30 Motion for Status Hearing; Directing parties to confer and, on or before the close of business on Friday, May 1, 2020, inform the Court. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/30/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Emergency MOTION for Other Relief Status Conference by J. S. G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Ms. Hodge Email I, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Ms. Hodge Email II, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Status Conference)(Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER directing parties to submit written updates on or before dates indicated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/29/2020. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCheck Received on 4/27/2020 from MARK STUART FELDMAN. Check Number: 176. Amount: $1.00; Receipt # 14637122465. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Remark: Receipt for $1.00 Registry Payment re ECF 27 (ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #7 Petitioner's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/26/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/26/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Phillips on behalf of Heidi Stirrup (Phillips, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Directing the United States Attorney to Respond to the Petition BY THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON APRIL 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/21/2020. (c/em 4/21/20)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by J. S. G. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting TRO, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting PI)(Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Samantha Hsieh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8619839.) by J. S. G.(Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0416-8619553.), filed by J. S. G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - JSG ORR Placement Authorization, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - JSG BCC Weekly Updates, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Decl. of Cynthia Hodge, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - IJ's Order Denying Reopening, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Consolidated Emails between Counsel and ORR, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Flores TRO Order I, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Flores TRO Order II, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Release)(Cubas, Claudia) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Hsieh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Claudia Raquel Cubas Esq.