This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2020 at 10:09:59 (UTC).

G. v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 G filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01762

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katherine G.

Defendants

DNV GL USA, Inc.

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amar Bharat Raval

Attorney at Berg Plummer Johnson Raval

3700 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Jamila Shukura Nelson Mensah

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Kimberly Frances Cheeseman

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77004

Robert C Deegan

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin James Bishop

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 S. Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Benjamin S Paulsen

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, DNV GL USA, Inc. filed by Katherine G.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Katherine G.. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting #20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

20 #2

Proposed Order

20 #1

Exhibit 1

#20

(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Katherine G., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#19

(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, DNV GL USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2020. (Deegan, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Answer or Other Response due by 7/1/2020.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time (Joint) to File Responsive Pleadings by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, DNV GL USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/7/2020. (Deegan, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly F. Cheeseman on behalf of DNV GL USA, Inc., filed. (Cheeseman, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J. Bishop on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, filed. (Bishop, Martin) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to DNV GL USA, Inc. served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Katherine G., filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to DNV GL USA, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to DNV GL USA, Inc., filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#1

(#22) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, DNV GL USA, Inc. filed by Katherine G.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Katherine G.. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, DNV GL USA, Inc. filed by Katherine G.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Katherine G.. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Katherine G., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, DNV GL USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2020. (Deegan, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Answer or Other Response due by 7/1/2020.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time (Joint) to File Responsive Pleadings by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, DNV GL USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/7/2020. (Deegan, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly F. Cheeseman on behalf of DNV GL USA, Inc., filed. (Cheeseman, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamila S. Mensah on behalf of DNV GL USA, Inc., filed. (Mensah, Jamila) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Benjamin S. Paulsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Robert C. Deegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas identifying Health Care Service Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Bishop, Martin) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J. Bishop on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, filed. (Bishop, Martin) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to DNV GL USA, Inc. served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Katherine G., filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to DNV GL USA, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to DNV GL USA, Inc., filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, DNV GL USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24687048) filed by Katherine G..(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Minnesota is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amar B. Raval