This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2021 at 09:37:34 (UTC).

G. et al v. New York City Department Of Education,

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 G filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against New York City Department Of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin K. Hellerstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00641

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin K. Hellerstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Y. G.

Defendant

New York City Department Of Education,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin Elizabeth Murray

Attorney at Cuddy Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

5693 South Street Road

Auburn, NY 13021

Defendant Attorney

Philip Sebastian Frank

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street, Ste 2-167

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Frank, Philip) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Philip S. Frank dated March 18, 2021. Upon Plaintiff's consent, Defendant's request is granted. SO ORDERED. New York City Department Of Education, answer due 3/22/2021. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/19/2021) (jca) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Philip S. Frank dated March 18, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Frank, Philip) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Upon consent of the parties, the request for enlargement is so ordered. (New York City Department Of Education, answer due 3/18/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/17/21) (yv) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#5

(#5) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Philip S. Frank dated February 16, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Frank, Philip) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,..(jgo) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Y. G.(individually ), Y. G.(on behalf of C.T., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department Of Education,. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23670319)Document filed by Y. G.(individually ), Y. G.(on behalf of C.T., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Frank, Philip) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Philip S. Frank dated March 18, 2021. Upon Plaintiff's consent, Defendant's request is granted. SO ORDERED. New York City Department Of Education, answer due 3/22/2021. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/19/2021) (jca) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Philip S. Frank dated March 18, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Frank, Philip) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Upon consent of the parties, the request for enlargement is so ordered. (New York City Department Of Education, answer due 3/18/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/17/21) (yv) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Philip S. Frank dated February 16, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Frank, Philip) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,..(jgo) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Y. G.(individually ), Y. G.(on behalf of C.T., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department Of Education,. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23670319)Document filed by Y. G.(individually ), Y. G.(on behalf of C.T., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York City Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Elizabeth Murray