This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 07:14:05 (UTC).

G. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 G filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-30091

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

G. G.

Y. G.

Defendants

Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company

Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. King

Attorney at Attorney at Law

336 S. 300 E Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Mala M. Rafik

Attorney at Rosenfeld & Rafik, P.C.

184 High Street, Suite 503

Boston, MA 02110

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Jovana Vujovic

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

666 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Michael H. Bernstein

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

666 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Julianna M. Charpentier

Attorney at Robinson & Cole

One Boston Place

Boston, MA 02108-4404

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by G. G., Y. G..(Rafik, Mala) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#32

(#32) ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503.(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#28

(#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jovana Vijovic Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9448721 by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503.(Charpentier, Julianna) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael H. Bernstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9448708 by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503.(Charpentier, Julianna) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

26 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

26 #1

Affidavit of Brian S. King

26 #26

Main Document

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company to 5/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/9/22. (alf) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by G. G., Y. G. as to CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company Waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/23/22. (alf) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 02/22/2022. (lwh) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs G. G., Y. G. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by G. G., Y. G..(Rafik, Mala) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503.(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jovana Vujovic. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Zamorski, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael H. Bernstein. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Zamorski, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian S. King. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Zamorski, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jovana Vijovic Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9448721 by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503.(Charpentier, Julianna) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael H. Bernstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9448708 by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503.(Charpentier, Julianna) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian S. King Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9441642 by G. G., Y. G.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian S. King, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rafik, Mala) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Defendants' Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' responsive to Plaintiffs' complaint shall be filed on or before 8/12/2022. (Zamorski, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/12/2022 to File Answer by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503.(Charpentier, Julianna) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company to 5/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/9/22. (alf) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Attorney Michael H. Bernstein added to party CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company(pty:dft)(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by G. G., Y. G. as to Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503 served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Issued Summons)(King, Brian) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan 503. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by G. G., Y. G. as to CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company Waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/23/22. (alf) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 02/22/2022. (lwh) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 02/22/2022. (lwh) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, Massmutual Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, 503 (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4243200) filed by G. G., Y. G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (King, Brian) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs G. G., Y. G. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jovana Vujovic

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julianna M. Charpentier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael H. Bernstein