This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 09:45:54 (UTC).

G. et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 G filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are David Nuffer and Paul Kohler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Nuffer

Referral Judge

Paul Kohler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C. G.

E. G.

Defendant

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Nediha Hadzikadunic

Attorney at GROSS & ROONEY

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan M. Webster

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

10 S Wacker Dr 40Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

Rebecca R. Hanson

Attorney at REED SMITH

10 S Wacker Dr 40Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

Maralyn M. English

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Benjamin S. Paulsen

Attorney at REED SMITH

10 S Wacker Dr 40Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Nediha Hadzikadunic filed by Brian S. King on behalf of C. G., E. G. (King, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Exhibit PHV Application of Benjamin S. Paulsen

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit PHV Application of Bryan M. Webster

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan M. Webster , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3730419,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Bryan M. Webster, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Maralyn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit PHV Application of Rebecca R. Hanson

#7

(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca R. Hanson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3730416,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Rebecca R. Hanson, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by C. G., E. G. as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island Waiver sent on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 8/24/20 (alt) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3692703) filed by C. G., E. G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (King, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs C. G., E. G. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Nediha Hadzikadunic filed by Brian S. King on behalf of C. G., E. G. (King, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin S. Paulsen for Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/24/20 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rebecca R. Hanson; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bryan M. Webster: both for Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/24/20 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin S. Paulsen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3730428,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Benjamin S. Paulsen, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Maralyn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan M. Webster , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3730419,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Bryan M. Webster, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Maralyn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca R. Hanson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3730416,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Rebecca R. Hanson, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by C. G., E. G. as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island Waiver sent on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 8/24/20 (alt) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/24/2020. (pjd) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURTThis case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3692703) filed by C. G., E. G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (King, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs C. G., E. G. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan M. Webster

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca R. Hanson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maralyn M. English