Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2020 at 07:45:58 (UTC).

FX Solutions, Inc. v. Goettsche

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 FX Solutions, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Goettsche. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam E Haddon, Brian Morris and Kathleen L. DeSoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen L. DeSoto

Presiding Judges

Sam E Haddon

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FX Solutions, Inc.

Defendant

Matthew Brent Goettsche

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kris McLean

Attorney at Kris A. McLean Law Firm, PLLC

Po Box 1136

Florence, MT 59833

Tyson A. McLean

Attorney at KRIS MCLEAN LAW FIRM, PLLC

315 W. Pine Street

Missoula, MT 59802

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Kirby Brooke

Attorney at SMITH & STEPHENS

315 West Pine Street

Missoula, MT 59802-4119

John E. Smith

Attorney at SMITH & STEPHENS

315 West Pine Street

Missoula, MT 59802-4119

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Brent Goettsche. All Defendants. (Smith, John) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit M to Consolidate

#5

(#5) Notice of Joinder by Matthew Brent Goettsche re: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M to Consolidate) (Brooke, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on January 17, 2020, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/9/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Matthew Brent Goettsche, filed by FX Solutions, Inc. (APP) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

2 #1

State Court Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Removal) (APP) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#43

(#19) ORDER STAYING CASE until April 22, 2020, and setting Telephonic Status Conference for 4/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/3/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM-KLD (APP) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#42

(#18) STIPULATION by Kevin Washington. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM-KLD (McLean, Kris) Modified on 3/3/2020 to change event to "stipulated motion". (SLR). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#41

(#17) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1) Cause No. CV-20-02-BU-BMM-KLD remains assigned to the Honorable Brian Morris, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings and entry of judgment; 2) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Cause No. CV-20-02-BU-BMM-KLD is referred to the Honorable Kathleen L. Desoto, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); 3) Cause No. CV-20-03-BU-BMM remains assigned to the Honorable Brian Morris, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings and entry of judgment; 4) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Cause No. CV-20-03-BU-BMM is referred to the Honorable Kathleen L. Desoto, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/27/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (SLR) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#39

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyson A. McLean on behalf of FX Solutions, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (McLean, Tyson) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#38

(#15) Notice of Correction: re (37 in 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 14 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM) Brief/Memorandum in Support, (13 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM, 36 in 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD) MOTION to Stay . The filing error relates to: Signature and Login Do not Match. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (SLR) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

37 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#37

(#14) Brief/Memorandum in Support re (13 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM) MOTION to Stay filed by Matthew Brent Goettsche. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (Brooke, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#36

(#13) MOTION to Stay Nicholas Kirby Brooke appearing for Defendant Matthew Brent Goettsche Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (Brooke, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

1 #2

state court complaint

1 #1

civil cover sheet

#1

(#5) Notice of Joinder by Matthew Brent Goettsche re: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M to Consolidate) (Brooke, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/12/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER STAYING CASE until April 22, 2020, and setting Telephonic Status Conference for 4/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/3/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM-KLD (APP) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION by Kevin Washington. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM-KLD (McLean, Kris) Modified on 3/3/2020 to change event to "stipulated motion". (SLR). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto added. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (SLR) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1) Cause No. CV-20-02-BU-BMM-KLD remains assigned to the Honorable Brian Morris, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings and entry of judgment; 2) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Cause No. CV-20-02-BU-BMM-KLD is referred to the Honorable Kathleen L. Desoto, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); 3) Cause No. CV-20-03-BU-BMM remains assigned to the Honorable Brian Morris, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings and entry of judgment; 4) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Cause No. CV-20-03-BU-BMM is referred to the Honorable Kathleen L. Desoto, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/27/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (SLR) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyson A. McLean on behalf of FX Solutions, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (McLean, Tyson) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Correction: re (37 in 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 14 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM) Brief/Memorandum in Support, (13 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM, 36 in 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD) MOTION to Stay . The filing error relates to: Signature and Login Do not Match. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (SLR) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Brief/Memorandum in Support re (13 in 2:20-cv-00003-BMM) MOTION to Stay filed by Matthew Brent Goettsche. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (Brooke, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Stay Nicholas Kirby Brooke appearing for Defendant Matthew Brent Goettsche Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (Brooke, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Brent Goettsche. All Defendants. (Smith, John) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Matthew Brent Goettsche answer due 2/7/2020. (SLR) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Matthew Brent Goettsche, filed by Kevin Washington. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (APP) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 State Court Motion, #2 State Court Brief, #3 State Court Order, #4 State Court Certificate of Service, #5 State Court Certificate of Notice, #6 State Court Notice of Rremoval) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (APP) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED. Case Number CV-20-03-BU-SEH is hereby REASSIGNED to the undersigned and will henceforth be numbered CV-20-03-BU-BMM. Pursuant to Section 8(h) of the Guide for Filing in the District of Montana, all documents shall be e-filed in the LEAD CASE (CV-20-02-BU-BMM-KLD) and spread to the MEMBER CASE (CV-20-03-BU-BMM) unless otherwise ordered. When prompted to spread, users should answer "yes". Users may contact the Clerks Office for assistance in filing documents. Cases in case 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/14/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00002-BMM-KLD, 2:20-cv-00003-BMM (SLR) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Joinder by Matthew Brent Goettsche re: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M to Consolidate) (Brooke, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Amended Notice of Removal due by 1/17/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on January 17, 2020, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/9/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Matthew Brent Goettsche, filed by FX Solutions, Inc. (APP) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Removal) (APP) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2423807 (ASG) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Brent Goettsche from Montana Second Judicial District Court, case number 19-452. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 state court complaint) (ASG) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kris McLean