Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 15:52:09 (UTC).

Future Link Systems, LLC v. Realtek Semiconductor Corporation

Case Summary

On April 13, 2021, Future Link Systems, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Future Link”), represented by Reza Mirzaie of Russ August & Kabat, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Realtek Semiconductor Corp. (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages with prejudgment and post-judgment interests among other reliefs, for alleged unlawful infringement of United States patents owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

 

Future Link asserted that Plaintiff filed this complaint for the infringement of United States Patent No. 7,917,680 entitled “Performance-Based Packet Ordering in a PCI Express Bus.”(“’680 Patent”) (the “Asserted Patent”) owned by them.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that Defendant has infringed Asserted Patent “(i) by selling, offering for sale, or importing into the United States, certain products (“Accused Products”), including products that use processors supporting ARM AMBA AXI4 or newer, including without limitation the Realtek RTD1295, that directly infringe, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, at least Claim 1 of the ’680 Patent; (ii) Defendant continues to actively encourage and instruct its customers and end-users (for example, through user manuals and online instruction materials on its website) to use the Accused Products in ways that directly infringe the ’680 Patent. Defendant does so knowing and intending that its customers and end-users will commit these infringing acts and (iii) Defendant has also infringed and continues to infringe, at least Claim 1 of the ’680 Patent by selling, offering for sale, or importing into the United States, the Accused Products, knowing that the Accused Products constitute a material part of the inventions claimed in the ’680 Patent, are specially made or adapted to infringe the ’680 Patent, and are not staple articles or commodities of commerce suitable for non-infringing use.”

 

Furthermore, the Plaintiff alleged upon information and belief that “Defendant has engaged in such actions with specific intent to cause infringement or with willful blindness to the resulting infringement because the Google has had actual knowledge of the ’680 Patent and that its acts were inducing infringement of the ’680 Patent since Google has had knowledge of the ’680 Patent.”

 

In the only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, Infringement of the ʼ680 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 (b) has been alleged, wherein it has been alleged that Defendant has had knowledge of the ’680 Patent and the infringing nature of the Accused Products. Despite this knowledge of the ’680 Patent, Defendant allegedly continues to actively encourage and instruct its customers and end-users to use the Accused Products in ways that directly infringe at least Claim 1 of the ’680 Patent.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to declare that the Defendant has Infringed ’680 Patent; to award permanent injunctive relief against Defendant; to award damages, costs, expenses, and prejudgment and post-judgment interest; to pass an order finding that this is an exceptional case within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to award the Plaintiff its reasonable attorneys’ fees; and an award of enhanced damages to Plaintiff as a result of Defendant’s willful infringement.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.







Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00363

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Future Link Systems, LLC

Defendant

Realtek Semiconductor Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Y. Chan

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Milkey

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey Lance Johnson

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

609 Main, 40Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Realtek Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Future Link Systems, LLC. Realtek Semiconductor Corporation served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Ma for Minna Chan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14699850) by on behalf of Future Link Systems, LLC. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Ma for James Milkey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14699845) by on behalf of Future Link Systems, LLC. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Realtek Semiconductor Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#6

(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Minna Y. Chan and James Milkey. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Future Link Systems, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Future Link Systems, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Cases by Future Link Systems, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14694357), filed by Future Link Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

5 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Realtek Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Future Link Systems, LLC. Realtek Semiconductor Corporation served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Minna Y. Chan for Future Link Systems, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Milkey for Future Link Systems, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Ma for Minna Chan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14699850) by on behalf of Future Link Systems, LLC. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Ma for James Milkey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14699845) by on behalf of Future Link Systems, LLC. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Realtek Semiconductor Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Minna Y. Chan and James Milkey. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Future Link Systems, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Future Link Systems, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Cases by Future Link Systems, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14694357), filed by Future Link Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Future Link Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Realtek Semiconductor Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Milkey