This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 07:44:33 (UTC).

Futrell et al v. Cargill, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Futrell filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Cargill, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Tony N. Leung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-00969

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Futrell

April Brown

Chris Rogers

Defendant

Cargill, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Scott Parmet

Attorney at Parmet PC

3 Riverway, Ste. 1910

Houston, TX 77056

Michael N Hanna

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

2000 Town Center, Ste 1900

Southfield, MI 48075

Rolf Fiebiger

Attorney at Fiebiger Law LLC

6800 France Ave S, Suite 190

Edina, MN 55435

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha Rollins

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Terran C. Chambers

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Cargill, Incorporated. filed by James Futrell, April Brown, Chris Rogers. No summons requested. (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Rollins on behalf of Cargill, Incorporated. (Rollins, Samantha) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

15 #1

Exhibit(s) 1 - Consent

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) ORDER on #12 Stipulation. Cargill, Incorporated answer due 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/5/2022. (HAM) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#13

(#13) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Chambers, Terran) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION by Cargill, Incorporated. Jointly Signed by James Futrell, April Brown, and All Others Similarly Situated. (Chambers, Terran) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Cargill, Incorporated. (Chambers, Terran) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

10 #4

Exhibit(s) 4 - Consent

10 #3

Exhibit(s) 3 - Consent

10 #2

Exhibit(s) 2 - Consent

10 #1

Exhibit(s) 1 - Consent

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Futrell, April Brown. Cargill, Incorporated served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Fiebiger, Rolf) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Terran C. Chambers on behalf of Cargill, Incorporated. (Chambers, Terran) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael N. Hanna. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9453508 filed by April Brown, James Futrell. (Fiebiger, Rolf) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Cargill, Incorporated. (MMG) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Scott Parmet. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9450881 filed by April Brown, James Futrell. (Fiebiger, Rolf) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Cargill, Incorporated. filed by James Futrell, April Brown, Chris Rogers. No summons requested. (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Rollins on behalf of Cargill, Incorporated. (Rollins, Samantha) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by April Brown, James Futrell of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Consent)(Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER on #12 Stipulation. Cargill, Incorporated answer due 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/5/2022. (HAM) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Chambers, Terran) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION by Cargill, Incorporated. Jointly Signed by James Futrell, April Brown, and All Others Similarly Situated. (Chambers, Terran) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Cargill, Incorporated. (Chambers, Terran) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by April Brown, James Futrell of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Consent, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Consent, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Consent, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Consent)(Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Futrell, April Brown. Cargill, Incorporated served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Fiebiger, Rolf) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Terran C. Chambers on behalf of Cargill, Incorporated. (Chambers, Terran) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael N Hanna for April Brown and James Futrell. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/18/2022. (ABR) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Scott Parmet for April Brown and for James Futrell. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/18/2022. (JGK) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael N. Hanna. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9453508 filed by April Brown, James Futrell. (Fiebiger, Rolf) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Cargill, Incorporated. (MMG) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Docket(#3) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-969 JRT/TNL. (MMG) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Scott Parmet. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9450881 filed by April Brown, James Futrell. (Fiebiger, Rolf) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cargill, Incorporated (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9450819) filed by James Futrell, April Brown. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fiebiger, Rolf) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cargill, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Melanie Rollins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terran C Chambers