This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2020 at 08:47:13 (UTC).

Fust et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Fust filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-12394

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carol Fust

Dieter Fust

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS NOS. 1-10

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION

PTI ROYSTON LLC a Georgia Limited Liability Company doing business as Pharma Tech Industries

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert David Cheeley

Attorney at Cheeley Law Group, LLC

Suite A, 299 South Main Street

Alpharetta, GA 30009

Julia Ann Merritt

Attorney at Cheeley Law Group, LLC

Suite 200, 2500 Old Milton Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30009

Roy E. Barnes

Attorney at The Barnes Law Group, LLC

31 Atlanta Street

Marietta, GA 30060

JOHN RAYMOND BEVIS

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

31 Atlanta Street

Marietta, GA 30060

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline Gieser

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon

1230 Peachtree Street, Suite 1200

Atlanta, GA 30309

Colin Kamrath Kelly

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

1230 Peachtree St. Ne, Ste 1200

Atlanta, GA 30309

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

SUSAN M. SHARKO

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus

Florham Park, NJ 07932

JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

10 Morristown Road

Gillette, NJ 07933

Ann Thornton Field

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani

2005 Market Street, Suite, 2900, 15-561-2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Chad Allan Shultz

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

55 Ivan Allen Jr. Blvd., Nw, Suite 750

Atlanta, GA 30308

MARK K. SILVER

Attorney at COUGHLIN DUFFY LLP

350 Mount Kemble Avenue, Po Box 1917

Morristown, NJ 07962-1917

JANET LYNN POLETTO

Attorney at HARDIN, KUNDLA, MCKEON, POLETTO & POLIFRONI, PC

673 Morris Avenue, Po Box 730

Springfield, NJ 07081-0730

David C. Marshall

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP-GA

Suite 4000, 303 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

CAROLINE M. TINSLEY

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Dieter Fust, Carol Fust re #18 MOTION to Remand (BEVIS, JOHN) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#28

(#28) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY re #18 MOTION to Remand (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#27

(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by PTI ROYSTON LLC re #18 MOTION to Remand (TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

26 #1

Certificate of Service

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. re #18 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#25

(#25) MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by PTI ROYSTON LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

18 #2

Text of Proposed Order

18 #1

Brief

#18

(#26) MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. re #18 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

3 #7

Exhibit F

3 #6

Exhibit E

3 #5

Exhibit D

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint within the #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. Discovery ends on 1/11/2021.(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - CAMC Consent to Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court File

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#1

(#10) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PTI Royston, LLC.(Marshall, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/21/2020 to remove double wording (jta). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Dieter Fust, Carol Fust re #18 MOTION to Remand (BEVIS, JOHN) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY re #18 MOTION to Remand (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by PTI ROYSTON LLC re #18 MOTION to Remand (TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. re #18 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by PTI ROYSTON LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE M. TINSLEY on behalf of PTI ROYSTON LLC (TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PTI Royston, LLC.(Marshall, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/21/2020 to remove double wording (jta). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company identifying Corporate Parent Freeport-McMoRan, Inc., Corporate Parent Freeport Minerals Corporation for Cyprus Amax Minerals Company by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Shultz, Chad) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand -ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Shultz, Chad) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/19/2020. (jta) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/20.(aaq) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson. (aaq) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Johnson & Johnson.(aaq) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Johnson & Johnson, and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(aaq) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint within the #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. Discovery ends on 1/11/2021.(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC - 10030775) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court File, #3 Exhibit 3 - CAMC Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PTI Royston, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant