Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2019 at 07:05:14 (UTC).

Fusion Industries LLC v. Whalen et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 Fusion Industries LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Whalen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin J. Cauthron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00691

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin J. Cauthron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fusion Industries LLC

Defendants

James Bozek

Jeffrey Whalen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terry F Stokes

Attorney at Rubenstein & Pitts PLLC

1503 E 19Th St

Edmond, OK 73013

Defendant Attorney

Sara E Potts

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson-OKC

210 Park Ave, Suite 1200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Reply Out of Time. Defendants shall file a reply within 10 days of this order. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 09/18/19. (wh) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to File Reply by All Defendants. (Potts, Sara) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

4 #13

Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Halcon Agreement

4 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 12 - SEM Agreement

4 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Whalen OK Licensing

4 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Email re Whalen OK licensing

4 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Emails re Bozek expense processing

4 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Emails re Whalen expense processing

4 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Emails re OK help

4 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Bozek Paystub

4 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Whalen Paystub

4 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Email re Employees by Division

4 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Bozek Employment Offer

4 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Whalen Employment Offer

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Daniel Fritts

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Fusion Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Daniel Fritts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Whalen Employment Offer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Bozek Employment Offer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Email re Employees by Division, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Whalen Paystub, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Bozek Paystub, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Emails re OK help, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Emails re Whalen expense processing, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Emails re Bozek expense processing, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Email re Whalen OK licensing, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Whalen OK Licensing, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - SEM Agreement, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Halcon Agreement)(Stokes, Terry) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit MTD Ex. 2 - Bozek Aff

3 #1

Exhibit MTD Ex. 1 - Whalen Aff

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Reply Out of Time. Defendants shall file a reply within 10 days of this order. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 09/18/19. (wh) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to File Reply by All Defendants. (Potts, Sara) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Fusion Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Daniel Fritts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Whalen Employment Offer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Bozek Employment Offer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Email re Employees by Division, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Whalen Paystub, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Bozek Paystub, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Emails re OK help, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Emails re Whalen expense processing, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Emails re Bozek expense processing, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Email re Whalen OK licensing, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Whalen OK Licensing, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - SEM Agreement, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Halcon Agreement)(Stokes, Terry) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTD Ex. 1 - Whalen Aff, #2 Exhibit MTD Ex. 2 - Bozek Aff)(Potts, Sara) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Sara E Potts on behalf of James Bozek, Jeffrey Whalen (Potts, Sara) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2967279. (Potts, Sara) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2019-3168 filed by Jeffrey Whalen, James Bozek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OK County Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Service by Mail, #4 Exhibit 4 - SEP EOA for Jeffrey Whalen, #5 Exhibit 5 - SEP EOA for James Bozek, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara E Potts