This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2021 at 10:36:35 (UTC).

Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC v. Anker Innovations Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Anker Innovations Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00339

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC

Defendants

Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect

Anker Innovations Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

John G. Day

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward J. DeFranco, Brian P. Biddinger, Joseph Milowic III, Kevin P.B. Johnson, David A. Hubbard, Cary Adickman, and Ron Hagiz - filed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, by Anker Innovations Ltd., Fantasia Trading LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to April 26, 2021 - filed by Fantasia Trading LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. Fantasia Trading LLC served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#4

(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,239,111 B2; US 8,624,550 B2; US 7,453,233 B2; US 6,936,936 B2. (kmd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Anker Innovations Ltd., Fantasia Trading LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3564257.) - filed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:21-cv-00340-CFC, 8 in 1:21-cv-00339-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward J. DeFranco, Brian P. Biddinger, Joseph Milowic III, Kevin P.B. Johnson, David A. Hubbard, Cary Adickman, and Ron Hagiz filed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/27/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00339-CFC, 1:21-cv-00340-CFC(fms) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward J. DeFranco, Brian P. Biddinger, Joseph Milowic III, Kevin P.B. Johnson, David A. Hubbard, Cary Adickman, and Ron Hagiz - filed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 Stipulation filed by Fantasia Trading LLC, Anker Innovations Ltd. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Fantasia Trading LLC answer due 6/11/2021, Anker Innovations Ltd. answer due 6/11/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/23/2021. (fms) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, by Anker Innovations Ltd., Fantasia Trading LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to April 26, 2021 filed by Fantasia Trading LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Fantasia Trading LLC answer due 4/26/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/25/2021. (fms) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to April 26, 2021 - filed by Fantasia Trading LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00339-CFC, 1:21-cv-00340-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. Fantasia Trading LLC served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,239,111 B2; US 8,624,550 B2; US 7,453,233 B2; US 6,936,936 B2. (kmd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Anker Innovations Ltd., Fantasia Trading LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3564257.) - filed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect is a litigant

Latest cases where Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Anker Innovations Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John G. Day