This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 07:37:06 (UTC).

Fund Recovery Services, LLC. v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Fund Recovery Services, LLC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against RBC Capital Markets, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05730

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fund Recovery Services, LLC.

Defendants

Spartan Specialty Finance I LLC

Daniel Wirzberger

James P. Uihlein

Noax, LLC

Margon LLC

B Money Holdings, LLC

Bergarviv, LLC

Byron Faermark

Barry Edmonson

Peter Ferro, Jr.

Merit Gaming Management Group, L.P.

Broadmark Capital, LLC

Sean Tomaszkiewicz

Raviv Wolfe

Robert Sheybani

Glenora Company

Spartan Specialty Finance I SPV

Joseph Canfora

Alhambra Circle Partners, LLC

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth Jay Ashman

Attorney at Ashman Law Office LLC

55 West Monroe St., Suite 2650

Chicago, IL 60603

Kenneth J. Ashman, J.

Attorney at Ashman Law, LLC

2801 Orange Brace Road

Riverwoods, IL 60015

Maurice R. Mitts

Attorney at Mitts Law, LLC

1822 Spruce Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Geoffrey P Huling, First

Attorney at Mitts Law, LLC

1822 Spruce Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Gerard M McCabe, First

Attorney at Mitts Law, LLC

1822 Spruce Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Joseph Small

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

David Barry Goroff

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

William J. McKenna, Jr.

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Scott T. Mendeloff

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Gabriel Aizenberg

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Carolina Y. Sales

Attorney at Bauch & Michaels, LLC

53 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 1115

Chicago, IL 60604

Paul M. Bauch

Attorney at Bauch & Michaels, LLC

53 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 1115

Chicago, IL 60604

Nishay Kumar Sanan

Attorney at Nishay K. Sanan, Esq.

53 W. Jackson, Suite 1437

Chicago, IL 60604

Other Attorneys

David Stephen Repking

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

77 W. Wacker Drive, Ste. 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Harold Abrahamson

Attorney at Abrahamson, Reed & Bilse

8230 Hohman Avenue

Munster, IN 46321

Steven Marc Malina

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#66

(#66) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bruce Goldstein by Nishay Kumar Sanan (Sanan, Nishay) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#60

(#60) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bruce Breitweiser, Joseph Canfora, Cardinal Trust, Barry Edmonson, Byron Faermark, Peter Ferro, Jr., Margon LLC, Mark Triffler Trust, Merit Gaming Management Group, L.P., Mark Triffler by Gabriel Aizenberg (Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#58

No Description Available

#54

No Description Available

#51

No Description Available

#49

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

#35

No Description Available

#33

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17493698. (McCabe, Gerard) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Fund Recovery Services, LLC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17478245.(Ashman, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fund Recovery Services, LLC. as to Noax, LLC on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Ashman, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fund Recovery Services, LLC.. Bruce Goldstein waiver sent on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/18/2021. (Ashman, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fund Recovery Services, LLC.. Alhambra Circle Partners, LLC waiver sent on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/18/2021. (Ashman, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bruce Goldstein by Nishay Kumar Sanan (Sanan, Nishay) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alhambra Circle Partners, LLC by Nishay Kumar Sanan (Sanan, Nishay) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Glenora Company, Little Owl Argon, LLC, James I. Uihlein, James P. Uihlein by Michael Joseph Small (Small, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Glenora Company, Little Owl Argon, LLC, James I. Uihlein, James P. Uihlein by David Barry Goroff (Goroff, David) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Glenora Company, Little Owl Argon, LLC, James I. Uihlein, James P. Uihlein by William J. McKenna, Jr (McKenna, William) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Fund Recovery Services, LLC. (Ashman, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bruce Breitweiser, Joseph Canfora, Cardinal Trust, Barry Edmonson, Byron Faermark, Peter Ferro, Jr., Margon LLC, Mark Triffler Trust, Merit Gaming Management Group, L.P., Mark Triffler by Gabriel Aizenberg (Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17493955. Maurice R. MItts (McCabe, Gerard) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17493698. (McCabe, Gerard) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Alhambra Circle Partners, LLC, Berj Arakelian, B Money Holdings, LLC, Mark Triffler Trust, Eric Schnosenberg, Robert Sheybani, Spartan Specialty Finance I LLC, Spartan Specialty Finance I SPV, LLC, Sean Tomaszkiewicz, Mark Triffler, Daniel Wirzberger, Raviv Wolfe, Gary Zumski (jg, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Barry Kostiner, John A. Kuhlman, Jr., Little Owl Argon, LLC, Harry Madanyan, Margon LLC, Merit Gaming Management Group, L.P., Noax, LLC, Peraza Capital & Investment, LLC, James I. Uihlein, James P. Uihlein (jg, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17492594. (Huling, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Bergarviv, LLC, Blue Treble Solutions, LLC, Bruce Breitweiser, Broadmark Capital, LLC, Joseph Canfora, Cardinal Trust, Barry Edmonson, Byron Faermark, Peter Ferro, Jr., Fintech Asset Management, LLC, Glenora Company, Bruce Goldstein (jg, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fund Recovery Services, LLC. by Kenneth Jay Ashman (Ashman, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ashman, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Fund Recovery Services, LLC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17478245.(Ashman, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FUND RECOVERY SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven M. Malina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harold Abrahamson