This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2022 at 08:20:20 (UTC).

Fund Recovery Services, LLC v. Latonya D. Kitchen et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 Fund Recovery Services, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Latonya D Kitchen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05351

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Appellant

Fund Recovery Services, LLC

Appellees

Latonya D. Kitchen

Karensa Hutchens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Peter John Roberts

Misha Tseytlin

Appellee Attorney

Jeffrey Wilens

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Transmittal Letter

1 #3

Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION by Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC for leave to appeal (Bowles, Aaron) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Notice of Filing

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC by Peter John Roberts (Roberts, Peter) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC by Misha Tseytlin (Tseytlin, Misha) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Set briefing as to motion for leave to appeal #2 : Responses due by 11/23/2022; replies due by 12/12/2022. Ruling on 1/26/2023 at 09:45 AM. Appellant shall direct a copy of this order to counsel of record for Appellees. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellees Karensa Hutchens, Latonya D. Kitchen by Jeffrey Wilens (Wilens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Appellees Karensa Hutchens, Latonya D. Kitchen for leave to appear as Pro Hac Vice (Wilens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE by Karensa Hutchens, Latonya D. Kitchenin Opposition to MOTION by Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC for leave to appeal #2 (Wilens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE by Karensa Hutchens, Latonya D. Kitchenin Opposition to MOTION by Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC for leave to appeal #2 (Wilens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Appellees Karensa Hutchens, Latonya D. Kitchen for leave to appear as Pro Hac Vice (Wilens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Docket(#8) PAYMENT by Karensa Hutchens, Latonya D. Kitchen of Pro Hac Fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20031218. (Wilens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellees Karensa Hutchens, Latonya D. Kitchen by Jeffrey Wilens (Wilens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Set briefing as to motion for leave to appeal #2 : Responses due by 11/23/2022; replies due by 12/12/2022. Ruling on 1/26/2023 at 09:45 AM. Appellant shall direct a copy of this order to counsel of record for Appellees. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC by Misha Tseytlin (Tseytlin, Misha) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC by Peter John Roberts (Roberts, Peter) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter) (gw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION by Appellant Fund Recovery Services, LLC for leave to appeal (Bowles, Aaron) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 21 A 48 (Judge Thorne) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(Bowles, Aaron) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less