This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:20:02 (UTC).

Funches, Reginald v. Dane County Jail Medical Staff

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Funches, Reginald filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dane County Jail Medical Staff. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00992

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reginald Funches

Madison, WI 53703

Defendant

Dane County Jail Medical Staff

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Reginald Funches's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/08/2020. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) Letter from Plaintiff Reginald Funches indicating he is not able to pay $1.80 initial partial payment at this time. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Reginald Funches assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.80 due 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/20/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER on ifp request: Trust Fund Account Statement due 12/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/6/2019. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Reginald Funches. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dane County Jail Medical Staff, filed by Reginald Funches. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Reginald Funches's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/08/2020. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Plaintiff Reginald Funches indicating he is not able to pay $1.80 initial partial payment at this time. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Reginald Funches assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.80 due 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/20/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Reginald Funches. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2019: #2 IPP Calculation) (nln). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER on ifp request: Trust Fund Account Statement due 12/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/6/2019. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Reginald Funches. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dane County Jail Medical Staff, filed by Reginald Funches. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.