This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:43:41 (UTC).

Fultz v. Hospitality South LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Fultz filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Hospitality South LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Norton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02987

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Fultz

Defendant

Hospitality South LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vanessa Ann Richardson

Attorney at VAR Law Firm

Po Box 4055

Pawleys Island, SC 29585

Lawrence Arthur Fuller

Attorney at Fuller Fuller and Associates PA

12000 Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 502

North Miami, FL 33181

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Jane Wolfe

Attorney at Gibbs and Holmes

Po Box 938

Charleston, SC 29402

Allan Riley Holmes

Attorney at Gibbs and Holmes

Po Box 938

Charleston, SC 29402

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Riley Holmes on behalf of Hospitality South LLC (Holmes, Allan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Fultz. Hospitality South LLC served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Refiled to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user and to correct event type. (jbry, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion by Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/21/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

5 #3

Supporting Documents Report of the Referee

5 #2

Supporting Documents Cert. of Good Standing

5 #1

Affidavit Application/Affidavit

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence A. Fuller ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9291024) by Mark Fultz. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Supporting Documents Report of the Referee)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Richardson, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospitality South LLC. (jbry, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mark Fultz.(jbry, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hospitality South LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9286821.), filed by Mark Fultz. Service due by 11/17/2020(jbry, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Riley Holmes on behalf of Hospitality South LLC (Holmes, Allan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Fultz. Hospitality South LLC served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Refiled to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user and to correct event type. (jbry, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion by Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/21/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence A. Fuller ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9291024) by Mark Fultz. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Supporting Documents Report of the Referee)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Richardson, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospitality South LLC. (jbry, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mark Fultz.(jbry, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hospitality South LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9286821.), filed by Mark Fultz. Service due by 11/17/2020(jbry, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less