This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 12:17:43 (UTC).

Fultz et al v. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Fultz filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is John E. Jones, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02107

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E. Jones, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kurtis Coates

Carol Shaner

Lacey Bainbridge

Lucinda Radaker

Jason Kohute

Miriam Fultz

Darlene Dalto

Darleen Dalto

Defendants

Michael Newsome

Thomas W. Wolf

American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13

Brian T. Lyman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan J. McGrath

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Justin Thomas Miller

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North 3Rd Street, 2Nd Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Curtis M Schube

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 N 3Rd St Floor 2

Harrisburg, PA 17055

Danielle RA Susanj

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant Attorneys

Caleb C Enerson

Attorney at PA Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Nancy A. Walker

Attorney at Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General

1600 Arch Street, Ste. 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Ramya Ravindran

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser PLLC

805 15Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Amy L. Rosenberger

Attorney at Willig, Williams & Davidson

1845 Walnut Street, 24Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Proposed Order

12 #1

Certificate of Concurrence

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Ravindran, Ramya) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Justin Thomas Miller terminated on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Miller, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner and associate counsel bar status verified. (rw) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Ramya Ravindran (eo) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ramya Ravindran on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 Attorney Ramya Ravindran is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5390895.. (Ravindran, Ramya) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb C Enerson on behalf of Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome, Thomas W. Wolf (Enerson, Caleb) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2021 11:15 AM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See order for call instructions. (eo) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Lacey Bainbridge, Kurtis Coates, Darlene Dalto, Miriam Fultz, Jason Kohute, Lucinda Radaker, Carol Shaner. (McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 identifying Corporate Parent American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 for American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13. (Rosenberger, Amy) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Rosenberger on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 (Rosenberger, Amy) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jason Kohute, Darlene Dalto, Lacey Bainbridge, Carol Shaner, Miriam Fultz, Kurtis Coates, Lucinda Radaker. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021; Brian T. Lyman waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021; Michael Newsome waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021; Thomas W. Wolf waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13, Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome, and Thomas W. Wolf ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5341338), filed by Jason Kohute, Darlene Dalto, Lacey Bainbridge, Carol Shaner, Miriam Fultz, Kurtis Coates, and Lucinda Radaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(rw) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy L. Rosenberger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramya Ravindran

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy A Walker