This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 09:55:32 (UTC).

Fulton et al v. Greco

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Fulton filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Greco. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Norton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-03158

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank Fulton

Carolyn Fulton

Defendant

Victoria R Greco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick W Carr

Attorney at Patrick Carr Law Office

Two Spanish Wells Road

Hilton Head Island, SC 29926

Defendant Attorney

Sarah Day Hurley

Attorney at Hurley Law PA

15 South Main Street, Suite 501

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/20/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/11/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 12/11/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/8/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/16/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/17/2021, Discovery due by 7/6/2021, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 7/20/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 9/1/2021, ADR Statement due by 8/1/2021, Mediation Due by 8/31/2021, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/2/2020. (jbry, ) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Plaintiffs' Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carolyn Fulton, Frank Fulton.(Carr, Patrick) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/23/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 9/23/2020 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Victoria R Greco.(Hurley, Sarah) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Victoria R Greco.(jbry, ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-27-00350. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9318276), filed by Victoria R Greco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(jbry, ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/20/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/11/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 12/11/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/8/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/16/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/17/2021, Discovery due by 7/6/2021, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 7/20/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 9/1/2021, ADR Statement due by 8/1/2021, Mediation Due by 8/31/2021, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/2/2020. (jbry, ) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiffs' Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carolyn Fulton, Frank Fulton.(Carr, Patrick) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/23/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 9/23/2020 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Victoria R Greco.(Hurley, Sarah) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Victoria R Greco.(jbry, ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-27-00350. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9318276), filed by Victoria R Greco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(jbry, ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less