This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2019 at 21:39:00 (UTC).

Fulton County Employees' Retirement System v. Blankfein et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Fulton County Employees' Retirement System filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Blankfein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01562

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fulton County Employees' Retirement System

Defendants

Mark A. Flaherty

Adebayo O. Ogunlesi

Mark O. Winkelman

Peter Oppenheimer

Lakshmi N. Mittal

David A. Viniar

M. Michele Burns

Jan E. Tighe

Ellen J. Kullman

David M. Solomon

Drew G. Faust

James A. Johnson

Lloyd Blankfein

William W. George

Nominal Defendant

The Goldman Sachs Group Inc.

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider and Defendant

Adebayo O. Ogunlesi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven B. Singer

Attorney at Saxena White P.A.

10 Bank Street 8Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10606

Adam Warden

Attorney at Saxena White P.A.

150 E Palmetto Park Road, Suite 600

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Brandon Thomas Grzandziel

Attorney at Saxena White, P.A

150 E. Palmetto Park Road Suite 600

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Maya S Saxena

Attorney at Saxena White P.A.

5200 Town Center Circle, Suite 601

Boca Raton, FL 33486

Joseph E. White, III

Attorney at Saxena White P.A.

150 E. Palmetto Park Road Suite 600

Boco Raton, FL 33432

Defendant and Nominal Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Robert Walker

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Sharon L. Nelles

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Matthew Alexander Schwartz

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

David Maxwell Rein

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad St.

New York, NY 10004

Julia A Malkina

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#42

41 #18

Exhibit R

41 #17

Exhibit Q

41 #13

Exhibit M

41 #12

Exhibit L

41 #11

Exhibit K

41 #10

Exhibit J

41 #9

Exhibit I

41 #8

Exhibit H

41 #7

Exhibit G

41 #6

Exhibit F

41 #5

Exhibit E

41 #2

Exhibit B

#41

#5

#3

#2

#1

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Sharon L. Nelles dated September 12, 2019 re: Oral Argument Request. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman.(Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) DECLARATION of Julia A. Malkina in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint.. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint. . Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman.(Nelles, Sharon) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER granting #37 Motion for Michael E. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Michael E. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17387075. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MOTION for Michael E. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17387075. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joseph E. White, III, #2 Affidavit Michael E. Kramer, #3 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE of Motion to Admit Michael E. Kramer Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joseph E. White, III, #2 Affidavit Michael E. Kramer, #3 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing of Michael E. Kramer, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) Modified on 8/7/2019 (wb). (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Singer, Steven) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned parties to this action, as follows: Plaintiff will serve and file the Amended Complaint on or before July 12, 2019. Defendants will have until September 12, 2019 to answer or move to dismiss the Amended Complaint. If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Defendants' joint memorandum in support of the Dismissal Motion shall be a single brief not exceeding 35 pages. Plaintiff will have until November 5, 2019 (or up to 54 days from the filing of the Dismissal Motion if filed earlier than September 12, 2019) to serve and file its opposition memorandum, which shall not exceed 35 pages. Defendants will have until December 20, 2019 (or up to 45 days from the filing of Plaintiff's opposition if filed earlier than November 5, 2019) to serve and file their joint reply memorandum, which shall not exceed 15 pages. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2019., Motions due by 9/12/2019., Responses due by 11/5/2019, Replies due by 12/20/2019.), Motions terminated: #33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Brandon Grzandziel dated 06/28/2019 filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/1/2019) (rro) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-12084-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (sj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 1:18cv12084. (sj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-12084-VSB. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Singer, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd Blankfein, David M. Solomon, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Singer, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Singer, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16372152)Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Singer, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Goldman Sachs & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Grzandziel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven B. Singer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph E. White