Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2019 at 07:43:43 (UTC).

Fuller v. Sonifi Solutions, Inc. et al.,

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 Fuller filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sonifi Solutions, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Edmund F. Brennan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01447

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Edmund F. Brennan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Albert Fuller

Defendants

Colony Capital

Lodge Net Corporation

Sonifi Solutions Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel Jefferson Frazier, III

Attorney at Frazier Law Team

7860 Mount Vernon Road

Auburn, CA 92065

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/10/2019 DISMISSED without prejudice Defendants Colony Capital and Lodge Net Corporation. (Reader, L) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to dismiss defendants Colony Capital and Lodge Net Corporation by Mark Albert Fuller. (Frazier, Samuel) Modified on 9/3/2019 (York, M). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#7

(#7) REQUEST for Dismissal without Prejudice of LodgeNet by Mark Albert Fuller. (Frazier, Samuel) Modified on 8/26/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Colony Capital on 8/5/2019, Answer due 10/4/2019 (Frazier, Samuel) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Sonifi Solutions Inc. on 8/5/2019, Answer due 10/4/2019 (Frazier, Samuel) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#4

(#4) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Mark Albert Fuller. (Frazier, Samuel) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Colony Capital, Lodge Net Corporation, Sonifi Solutions Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Samuel Jefferson Frazier, III* *Frazier Law Team* *7860 Mount Vernon Road* *Auburn, CA 92065*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mark A Fuller. Attorney Frazier, Samuel Jefferson added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8379756) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frazier, Samuel) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/10/2019 DISMISSED without prejudice Defendants Colony Capital and Lodge Net Corporation. (Reader, L) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to dismiss defendants Colony Capital and Lodge Net Corporation by Mark Albert Fuller. (Frazier, Samuel) Modified on 9/3/2019 (York, M). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Notice of Dismissal and Proposed Order (ECF No. 7). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST for Dismissal without Prejudice of LodgeNet by Mark Albert Fuller. (Frazier, Samuel) Modified on 8/26/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Colony Capital on 8/5/2019, Answer due 10/4/2019 (Frazier, Samuel) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Sonifi Solutions Inc. on 8/5/2019, Answer due 10/4/2019 (Frazier, Samuel) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Mark Albert Fuller. (Frazier, Samuel) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Colony Capital, Lodge Net Corporation, Sonifi Solutions Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Samuel Jefferson Frazier, III* *Frazier Law Team* *7860 Mount Vernon Road* *Auburn, CA 92065*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mark A Fuller. Attorney Frazier, Samuel Jefferson added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8379756) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frazier, Samuel) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONIFI SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Colony Capital, LLC is a litigant