This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 16:12:14 (UTC).

Fulkerson v. U.S. Department of Justice et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Fulkerson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against U S Department of Justice. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00481

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heath Vincent Fulkerson

Reno, NV 89506

Defendants

U.S. Department of Defense

Federal Communications Commission

Federal Aviation Administration

U.S. Department of Justice

 

Court Documents

8 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Heath Vincent Fulkerson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

3 #1

Notice of Assignment of Case to a Magistrate Judge

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/04/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/5/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

1 #2

Receipt

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

8 #1

Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment of Case to a Magistrate Judge)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

8 #2

Standing Order for All Judges

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/04/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Heath Vincent Fulkerson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/5/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment of Case to a Magistrate Judge)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt 34611147087). Filed by Heath Vincent Fulkerson. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.