This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 08:19:18 (UTC).

Fuimaono v. HI Southern Alaska, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Fuimaono filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against HI Southern Alaska, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon L. Gleason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emerald Fuimaono

Defendants

Hi Southern Alaska, Inc.

HI Southern Alaska, Inc

HI Southern Alaska, Inc doing business as Home Instead Senior Care

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac D. Zorea

Attorney at Law Office of Isaac Derek Zorea

Po Box 210434

Anchorage, AK 99521

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia A. Vecera

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (Anch)

1500 W. 33Rd Avenue, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99503-3502

Chad Thomas Darcy

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (Anch)

188 W Northern Lights Blvd., Suite 1100

Anchorage, AK 99503

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING and PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2020. TBC set 4/19/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/10/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#12

(#12) DISREGARD SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2020. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/10/20. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/11/2020 to indicate error and clarify docket text. See Docket Annotation dated 3/10/2020 (LMH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#10

(#10) TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: setting an up to 4 day bench trial to commence on April 19, 2021 at 9:00 AM and a Final Pretrial Conference set for April 8,2021 at 3:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. (See order for full details). Motions In Limine due by 3/8/2021. Witness List due by 3/29/21. Exhibit List due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/10/20. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Darcy, Chad) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A, 1-20

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing All State Court Documents by HI Southern Alaska, Inc re #3 Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 1-20)(Vecera, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by HI Southern Alaska, Inc (Darcy, Chad) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HI Southern Alaska, Inc. (Vecera, Patricia) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

5 #1

Scheduling and Planning Conference Report

#5

(#5) ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by HI Southern Alaska, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Darcy, Chad) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HI Southern Alaska, Inc from Superior Court State of Alaska, case number 3AN-19-9728CI. ( Filing fee $ 400/Receipt ANC016565), filed by HI Southern Alaska, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Removal)(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING and PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2020. TBC set 4/19/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/10/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Annotation: The parties are advised that the filing at docket #12 Scheduling Order is a duplicate filing to the one at docket #11 and should be disregarded as duplicate. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISREGARD SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2020. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/10/20. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/11/2020 to indicate error and clarify docket text. See Docket Annotation dated 3/10/2020 (LMH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: setting an up to 4 day bench trial to commence on April 19, 2021 at 9:00 AM and a Final Pretrial Conference set for April 8,2021 at 3:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. (See order for full details). Motions In Limine due by 3/8/2021. Witness List due by 3/29/21. Exhibit List due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/10/20. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Darcy, Chad) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing All State Court Documents by HI Southern Alaska, Inc re #3 Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 1-20)(Vecera, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by HI Southern Alaska, Inc (Darcy, Chad) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HI Southern Alaska, Inc. (Vecera, Patricia) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by HI Southern Alaska, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Darcy, Chad) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HI Southern Alaska, Inc from Superior Court State of Alaska, case number 3AN-19-9728CI. ( Filing fee $ 400/Receipt ANC016565), filed by HI Southern Alaska, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Removal)(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less