This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:17:35 (UTC).

Fuhrman v. Worldpay, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Fuhrman against Worldpay, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00695

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Susan J. Dlott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Fuhrman

Defendant

Worldpay, LLC

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Plaintiff David Fuhrman re #1 Complaint, OF STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Bruce, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Worldpay, LLC c/o Corporation Service Company. (eh) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Worldpay, LLC. Worldpay, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (cb) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (sct) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/26/2019. (jlw) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Worldpay, LLC. (jlw) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #2

Summons Form Summons x2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against David Fuhrman ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7076029), filed by David Fuhrman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x2) (Bruce, Matthew) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: Worldpay, LLC answer due 10/25/2019. (sct) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Plaintiff David Fuhrman re #1 Complaint, OF STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Bruce, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Worldpay, LLC c/o Corporation Service Company. (eh) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Worldpay, LLC. Worldpay, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (cb) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (sct) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/26/2019. (jlw) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Worldpay, LLC. (jlw) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against David Fuhrman ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7076029), filed by David Fuhrman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x2) (Bruce, Matthew) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.