This case was last updated from PACER on 04/11/2020 at 08:31:01 (UTC).

Fuentes v. Coyne-Fague

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Fuentes filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Coyne-Fague. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Samuel Fuentes

Cranston, RI 02920

Respondents

Particia Coyne-Fague

Attorney General for the State of Rhode Island

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Christopher R. Bush

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

150 South Main Street, 274-4400 X 2025, Fax: 222-5110

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 3/23/2020. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

7 #6

Exhibit Fuentes v. Wall, No. 08-1726, Judgment dated March 27, 2009

7 #4

Exhibit Order dated May 12, 2008 (No. 04-0048-ML)

7 #3

Exhibit Docket: Fuentes v. Wall, No. 04-0048-ML

7 #2

Exhibit Fuentes v. Vose, No. Civ. A. 94-0228T, 1994 WL 16014781 (D.R.I. Oct. 7,

7 #1

Exhibit Docket: P2-1978-0545A

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Attorney General for the State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 4/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket: P2-1978-0545A, #2 Exhibit Fuentes v. Vose, No. Civ. A. 94-0228T, 1994 WL 16014781 (D.R.I. Oct. 7, 1994), #3 Exhibit Docket: Fuentes v. Wall, No. 04-0048-ML, #4 Exhibit Order dated May 12, 2008 (No. 04-0048-ML), #5 Exhibit Objection to Motion to Reactivate Habeas Petition (No. 04-0048-ML), #6 Exhibit Fuentes v. Wall, No. 08-1726, Judgment dated March 27, 2009)(Bush, Christopher) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER entered directing the State of Rhode Island to respond; State of Rhode Island Response due by 4/1/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/2/2020. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Samuel Fuentes. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

2 #2

Envelope

2 #1

Attachment

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Samuel Fuentes. Responses due by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

1 #3

Receipt

1 #1

Attachments

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00. Receipt # 14670023446), filed by Samuel Fuentes. (3 copies received) (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope, #3 Receipt)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 4/8/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/6/2020. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Attorney General for the State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 4/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket: P2-1978-0545A, #2 Exhibit Fuentes v. Vose, No. Civ. A. 94-0228T, 1994 WL 16014781 (D.R.I. Oct. 7, 1994), #3 Exhibit Docket: Fuentes v. Wall, No. 04-0048-ML, #4 Exhibit Order dated May 12, 2008 (No. 04-0048-ML), #5 Exhibit Objection to Motion to Reactivate Habeas Petition (No. 04-0048-ML), #6 Exhibit Fuentes v. Wall, No. 08-1726, Judgment dated March 27, 2009)(Bush, Christopher) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for an Extension of Time Extend Time To Respond To Habeas Petition filed by Attorney General for the State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 4/15/2020. (Bush, Christopher) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as Petitioner has paid the $5.00 filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 3/23/2020. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 3/23/2020. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER entered directing the State of Rhode Island to respond; State of Rhode Island Response due by 4/1/2020. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/2/2020. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Samuel Fuentes. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Samuel Fuentes. Responses due by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00. Receipt # 14670023446), filed by Samuel Fuentes. (3 copies received) (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope, #3 Receipt)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Samuel Fuentes. Responses due by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00. Receipt # 14670023446), filed by Samuel Fuentes. (3 copies received) (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope, #3 Receipt)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher R. Bush