This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 07:35:33 (UTC).

FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC et al v. TBB AMERICA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against TBB AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark J. Dinsmore and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04457

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC

NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC

FELECIA KOERBER

Defendants

TONY PALOMBINO

Louisville, KY 40299

TBB AMERICA, LLC

11001 Bluegrass Parkway, #270

Louisville, KY 40299

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Josh F. Brown

Attorney at COHEN GARELICK & GLAZIER

8888 Keystone Crossing Blvd., Suite 800

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Stephanie Maris

Attorney at COHEN GARELICK & GLAZIER

8888 Keystone Crossing Blvd., Suite 800

Indianapolis, IN 46240

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER - Acknowledges Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/20/2019. (marginal notation)(CKM) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint within fourteen days of the date of this entry, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order by properly alleging a basis for diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/14/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#8

(#8) Submission of Signature Requirement re #3 Notice of Appearance by All Plaintiffs. (Maris, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#7

(#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to TONY PALOMBINO, TBB AMERICA, LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Josh F. Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Josh F. Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

1 #5

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5710687) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Brown, Josh) Modified on 11/6/2019 (AKH). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER - Acknowledges Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/20/2019. (marginal notation)(CKM) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint within fourteen days of the date of this entry, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order by properly alleging a basis for diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/14/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Submission of Signature Requirement re #3 Notice of Appearance by All Plaintiffs. (Maris, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to TONY PALOMBINO, TBB AMERICA, LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Josh F. Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Josh F. Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5710687) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Brown, Josh) Modified on 11/6/2019 (AKH). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less