This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:23:49 (UTC).

Frymire v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by Frymire against Monsanto Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00605

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

David J. Hale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John M. Frymire

Defendant

Monsanto Company

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 152 from ND/CA re MDL 2741. (KJA) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2930319), filed by John M. Frymire. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (AME) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-06055. (KJA) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Case transferred to District of ND/CA. Case electronically transferred. (KJA) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 152 from ND/CA re MDL 2741. (KJA) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (AME) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2930319), filed by John M. Frymire. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.