Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/07/2020 at 16:39:08 (UTC).

Fruichantie v. Saul

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Fruichantie filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ralph R. Beistline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ralph R. Beistline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Joe Fruichantie

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel S. Jones

Attorney at Law Office of Charles E. Binder and Harry J. Binder, LLC

485 Madison Ave, Suite 501

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle R. Mroczek

Attorney at Social Security Administration

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2900, M/S 221A

Seattle, WA 98104-7075

Steven E Skrocki

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Anch)

222 West 7Th Avenue, Rm 253 #9

Anchorage, AK 99513

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Joe Fruichantie. Andrew M. Saul served on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle R. Mroczek on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Mroczek, Danielle) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Skrocki, Steven) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel S. Jones, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant US Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant AG, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant SSA)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel S. Jones. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2887191.) by Thomas Joe Fruichantie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2887169.), filed by Thomas Joe Fruichantie.(Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle R. Mroczek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven E Skrocki