This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 05:51:24 (UTC).

Friscia v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Friscia filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04979

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeanine Friscia

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harold Skovronsky

1810 Avenue N

Brooklyn, NY 11230

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER 1. Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. If Defendant is unable to file the record by that date, then the Court should be notified in writing by that date. Such notification should include a request for an extension, which specifies a date and demonstrates the good cause for the extension, including the date the administrative record was requested, whether or not it has been received, and the most recent efforts made to obtain it. 2. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint on or before December 11, 2020. 3. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by January 8, 2021; Defendant shall file and serve a response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by February 5, 2021; and Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply, if any, by March 8, 2021. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/16/2020. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER 1. Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. If Defendant is unable to file the record by that date, then the Court should be notified in writing by that date. Such notification should include a request for an extension, which specifies a date and demonstrates the good cause for the extension, including the date the administrative record was requested, whether or not it has been received, and the most recent efforts made to obtain it. 2. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint on or before December 11, 2020. 3. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by January 8, 2021; Defendant shall file and serve a response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by February 5, 2021; and Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply, if any, by March 8, 2021. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/16/2020. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13535397 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Jeanine Friscia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Skovronsky, Harold) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less