Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 08:10:20 (UTC).

Frischhertz v. King et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Frischhertz filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against King. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01017

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Frischhertz

Defendants

Michael Looney Trucking, LLC

World Class Express, Inc.

Phillip King

Sokol Beli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Medlock

Attorney at Edwards Law

1101 East 11Th Street

Austin, TX 78702

Jeffrey S. Edwards

Attorney at Edwards Law

1101 E. 11Th St.

Austin, TX 78702

David Anthony James

Attorney at Edwards Law

1101 East 11Th Street

Austin, TX 78702

Michael Singley

Attorney at Edwards Law

The Haehnel Building, 1101 E. 11Th St.

Austin, TX 78702

Defendant Attorneys

Lynn S. Castagna

Attorney at Castagna Scott LLP

1120 S. Capital Of Texas Hwy, Bldg 2, Suite 270

Austin, TX 78746

Daryl Ray Hayes

Attorney at DC Law, PLLC

6615 Vaught Ranch Road, Ste. 102

Austin, TX 78730

David Lawrence Plaut

Attorney at Hanna & Plaut, LLP

211 East 7Th Street, Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

Karla Y. Huertas

Attorney at Hanna & Plaut

211 E. 7Th St., Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Motion to Transfer Case filed by Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Phillip King. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (td) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#15

(#15) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Eric Frischhertz. (Edwards, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

13 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order

#13

(#13) Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order by Eric Frischhertz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Edwards, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/25/2019 (td). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Parties by Sokol Beli, World Class Express, Inc.. (Plaut, David) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interested Parties by Phillip King, Michael Looney Trucking, LLC. (Castagna, Lynn) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Phillip King. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (td) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

9 #2

Proposed Order

3 #2

Proposed Order

#3

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Eric Frischhertz, re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Defendant Phillip King (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Declaration of Eric Frischhertz, M.D., #2 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Notice of Consent for Removal

1 #4

Supplement

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Index of Matters Being Filed

1 #1

Exhibit A - Crash Report

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Phillip King (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12740066), filed by Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Phillip King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Crash Report, #2 Exhibit B - Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement, #5 Exhibit Notice of Consent for Removal)(Castagna, Lynn) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions No Longer Referred: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case . (td) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Motion to Transfer Case filed by Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Phillip King. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (td) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Eric Frischhertz. (Edwards, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order by Eric Frischhertz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Edwards, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/25/2019 (td). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Interested Parties by Sokol Beli, World Class Express, Inc.. (Plaut, David) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Certificate of Interested Parties by Phillip King, Michael Looney Trucking, LLC. (Castagna, Lynn) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Phillip King. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (td) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Eric Frischhertz, re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Defendant Phillip King (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Declaration of Eric Frischhertz, M.D., #2 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief to Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Transfer Case by Eric Frischhertz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Singley on behalf of Eric Frischhertz. Attorney Michael Singley added to party Eric Frischhertz(pty:pla) (Singley, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Anthony James on behalf of Eric Frischhertz. Attorney David Anthony James added to party Eric Frischhertz(pty:pla) (James, David) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey S. Edwards on behalf of Eric Frischhertz (Edwards, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Transfer Case by Phillip King, Michael Looney Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Crash Report, #2 Proposed Order)(Castagna, Lynn) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Phillip King, Michael Looney Trucking, LLC. (cj) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Phillip King (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12740066), filed by Michael Looney Trucking, LLC, Phillip King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Crash Report, #2 Exhibit B - Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement, #5 Exhibit Notice of Consent for Removal)(Castagna, Lynn) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less