This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2019 at 07:53:28 (UTC).

Frink v. QCHC, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Frink filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against QCHC, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liles C Burke and Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00806

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Liles C Burke

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William D Frink

Defendants

St. Clair County, Alabama

QCHC, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D Wayne Rogers, Jr

Attorney at DeGARIS AND ROGERS, LLC

2 North 20Th Street, Ste. 1030

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

J Randall McNeill

Attorney at WEBB & ELEY PC

7475 Halcyon Pointe Drive, Po Box 240909

Montgomery, AL 36124

LaBella S Alvis

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

1800 Financial Center, 505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203-2696

Albert Whiting Copeland, II

Attorney at CHRISTIAN AND SMALL, LLP

505 North 20Th Street, Ste. 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: #3 MOTION to Dismiss, #5 MOTION to Strike Fictitious Parties, #6 DEFENDANT QCHC's FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)'s MOTION TO DISMISS, #12 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 10:30 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Corey L Maze. #9 Joint Motion to Hold Additional Rule 26(f) Meeting and to Extend the Rule 26(f) Written Report Deadline is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/24/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#12

(#12) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by St. Clair County, Alabama. (McNeill, J) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#11

(#11) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Unopposed Motion for HIPAA Order #10 is GRANTED; certain discovery information shall remain confidential as set out in this Order. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/8/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Hipaa Order by QCHC, Inc.. (Alvis, LaBella) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Hold Additional Rule 26(f) Meeting and to Extend the Rule 26(f) Written Report Deadline by QCHC, Inc.. (Alvis, LaBella) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze from the Unassigned Judge A civil cases (KAM) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT QCHC's FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)'s MOTION TO DISMISS by QCHC, Inc.. (Alvis, LaBella) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Strike Fictitious Parties by St. Clair County, Alabama. (McNeill, J) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by St. Clair County, Alabama. (McNeill, J) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by St. Clair County, Alabama. (McNeill, J) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#2

(#2) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/3/2019. (AHI ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by St. Clair County, Alabama, QCHC, Inc. (from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Alabama, case number 59-CV-2019-900073.00), filed by St. Clair County, Alabama, QCHC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: #3 MOTION to Dismiss, #5 MOTION to Strike Fictitious Parties, #6 DEFENDANT QCHC's FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)'s MOTION TO DISMISS, #12 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 10:30 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Corey L Maze. #9 Joint Motion to Hold Additional Rule 26(f) Meeting and to Extend the Rule 26(f) Written Report Deadline is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/24/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by St. Clair County, Alabama. (McNeill, J) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Unopposed Motion for HIPAA Order #10 is GRANTED; certain discovery information shall remain confidential as set out in this Order. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/8/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Hipaa Order by QCHC, Inc.. (Alvis, LaBella) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Hold Additional Rule 26(f) Meeting and to Extend the Rule 26(f) Written Report Deadline by QCHC, Inc.. (Alvis, LaBella) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER: The court sets the following briefing schedule on pending motions. The plaintiff shall respond to the defendants' motions to dismiss (docs. 3, 6) and motion to strike fictitious parties (doc. 5) on or before July 8, 2019. Plaintiff shall file one consolidated brief of no more than twenty-five pages, double-spaced. Defendants shall file reply briefs, if any, on or before July 22, 2019. Defendants' briefs shall not exceed ten pages each. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 06/24/19. (Maze, Corey) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze from the Unassigned Judge A civil cases (KAM) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT QCHC's FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)'s MOTION TO DISMISS by QCHC, Inc.. (Alvis, LaBella) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Strike Fictitious Parties by St. Clair County, Alabama. (McNeill, J) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by St. Clair County, Alabama. (McNeill, J) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss by St. Clair County, Alabama. (McNeill, J) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/3/2019. (AHI ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601098034. (JLC) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by St. Clair County, Alabama, QCHC, Inc. (from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Alabama, case number 59-CV-2019-900073.00), filed by St. Clair County, Alabama, QCHC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QCHC, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Randall McNeill