This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2021 at 09:35:28 (UTC).

Friends of the Inyo et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Friends of the Inyo filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against U S Forest Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr, Kendall J. Newman and Kimberly J. Mueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01955

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

Presiding Judges

Morrison C. England, Jr

Kimberly J. Mueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Friends of the Inyo

Western Watersheds Project

Center for Biological Diversity

Sierra Club

Defendants

U.S. Forest Service

Leeann Murphy

Intervenor Defendant

KORE Mining Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa Tamara Belenky

Attorney at Center for Biological Diversity

1212 Broadwaysuite 800

Oakland, CA 94612

Roger Flynn, PHV

Attorney at Western Mining Action Project

Po Box 349

Lyons, CO 80540

Talasi B. Brooks, PHV

Defendant Attorney

Tyler McVeigh Alexander

Attorney at DOJ-Enrd

150 M. St. Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Intervenor Defendant Attorney

Kerry Shapiro

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

2 Embarcadero Center, 5Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Inyo, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project. (Belenky, Lisa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Center for Biological Diversity et al re #8 Order. (Belenky, Lisa) Modified on 11/24/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/16/2021 GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Talasi B. Brooks, PHV for All Plaintiffs. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

15 #5

Proof of Service

15 #4

Proposed Order

15 #3

Proposed Answer

15 #2

Declaration of Marc Leduc

15 #1

Declaration of Kerry Shapiro

15 #15

Main Document

8 #3

VDRP

8 #8

Main Document

5 #1

certificate of good standing

5 #5

Main Document

3 #1

Consent Form

3 #3

Main Document

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Inyo, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project. (Belenky, Lisa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/12/2021: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Motion to Intervene, ECF No., #15 is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 12/17/2021 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry)(Kennison, L) (Entered: 12/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Center for Biological Diversity et al re #8 Order. (Belenky, Lisa) Modified on 11/24/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/16/2021 GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Talasi B. Brooks, PHV for All Plaintiffs. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROPOSED ORDER rere #15 MOTION to INTERVENE by KORE Mining Limited. (Shapiro, Kerry) Modified on 11/19/2021 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Intervenor Defendant KORE Mining Limited. (Shapiro, Kerry) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION TO INTERVENE by KORE Mining Limited. Attorney Shapiro, Kerry added. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kerry Shapiro, #2 Declaration of Marc Leduc, #3 Proposed Answer, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Shapiro, Kerry) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Regarding Limited Scope of Exploration Activities in 20212022 Winter Drilling Season by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Inyo, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project. (Belenky, Lisa) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tyler McVeigh Alexander on behalf of Leeann Murphy, U.S. Forest Service. Attorney Alexander, Tyler McVeigh added. (Alexander, Tyler) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Sierra Club, Friends of the Inyo, Center for Biological Diversity, Western Watersheds Project. Leeann Murphy served on 10/21/2021, U.S. Forest Service served on 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Belenky, Lisa) Modified on 11/5/2021 (Huang, H). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Roger Flynn re #9 Pro Hac Vice Application. (Belenky, Lisa) Modified on 10/28/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Inyo, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project for attorney Roger Flynn to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9895591) (Attachments: #1 Duplicate Application)(Belenky, Lisa) Modified on 11/1/2021 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to the 6 Minute Order Reassigning Case, this action is Randomly REASSIGNED to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. is no longer associated with this case. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:21-cv-1955 KJM KJN. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Donati, J) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to the senior status of District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., the Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to another district judge for all further proceedings. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Inyo, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project for attorney Talasi B. Brooks to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9888591) (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing)(Belenky, Lisa) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Inyo, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project. (Belenky, Lisa) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Leeann Murphy, U.S. Forest Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Lisa Tamara Belenky* *Center for Biological Diversity* *1212 Broadway, Suite 800* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs . Attorney Belenky, Lisa Tamara added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9885854) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Belenky, Lisa) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Forest Service is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Watersheds Project is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Club is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant