This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2020 at 08:12:07 (UTC).

FRIEND v. RUE21, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 FRIEND filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against RUE21, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joy Flowers Conti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01630

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joy Flowers Conti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELANIE FRIEND

MELANIE WIELAND

Defendant

RUE21, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel J. Cordes

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, 3Rd Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

John E. Black, III

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, 3Rd Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Emilie R. Hammerstein

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Megan Smith

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. In light of the joint motion to stay proceedings, this case is administratively closed pending the outcome of the parties' arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status update with the court at the conclusion of arbitration. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/10/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kjm) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MELANIE FRIEND. RUE21, INC. waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Black, John) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Smith on behalf of RUE21, INC.. (Smith, Megan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RUE21, INC.. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Arbitration by RUE21, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Black, III on behalf of MELANIE FRIEND. (Black, John) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to RUE21, INC. (cel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against RUE21, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5398569) filed by MELANIE FRIEND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rue21, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emilie R. Hammerstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Smith Esq.