This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2020 at 18:53:29 (UTC).

FRIEMAN v. WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 FRIEMAN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL H. SLOMSKY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01848

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL H. SLOMSKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIC FRIEMAN

Defendant

WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINCENT VAN LAAR

Attorney at BOCHETTO AND LENTZ, P.C.

1524 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC FRIEMAN. WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC. waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (VAN LAAR, VINCENT) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to George C. Morrison, Esquire on 04/13/2020 by ERIC FRIEMAN. Waiver of Service due by 5/13/2020. (VAN LAAR, VINCENT) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

1 #4

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14228756.), filed by ERIC FRIEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(VAN LAAR, VINCENT) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC FRIEMAN. WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC. waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (VAN LAAR, VINCENT) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to George C. Morrison, Esquire on 04/13/2020 by ERIC FRIEMAN. Waiver of Service due by 5/13/2020. (VAN LAAR, VINCENT) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/13/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14228756.), filed by ERIC FRIEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(VAN LAAR, VINCENT) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO INSURANCE SERVICES USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VINCENT VAN LAAR