This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:11:34 (UTC).

Friedman v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Friedman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gloria M. Navarro and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Friedman

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin G. Randall

Attorney at ER Injury Attorneys

4795 S. Durango Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Defendant Attorney

Troy Clark

Attorney at Resnick & Lewis, P.C.

8925 West Russell Road Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-846307-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6769075) by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial) (Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure

1 #4

Exhibit Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Kelly Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/8/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lisa Friedman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Randall, Justin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lisa Friedman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Randall, Justin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/2022. By Deputy Clerk: Kelly Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/8/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-846307-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6769075) by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial) (Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Troy A Clark