This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2022 at 07:04:52 (UTC).

FRID v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2021 FRID filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-20225

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMY FRID

Defendants

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

CITIBANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAAKOV SAKS

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plazasuite 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601-2726

Defendant Attorney

DOROTHY A. KOWAL

Attorney at PRICE, MEESE, SHULMAN & D'ARMINIO, PC

50 Tice Boulevard

Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITIBANK, N.A., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMY FRID. CITIBANK, N.A. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMY FRID. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney DOROTHY A. KOWAL for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. added. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with affirmative defenses by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with affirmative defenses by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint submitted by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/11/2021. (jdb) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney DOROTHY A. KOWAL for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. added. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMY FRID. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMY FRID. CITIBANK, N.A. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITIBANK, N.A., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITIBANK, N.A., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13004345) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMY FRID. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 11/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant