This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 07:38:11 (UTC).

Fricks v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Fricks filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04022

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fred Fricks

Defendant

Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wayne D Collins

Attorney at Barton Law Firm

1201 Shepherd Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorney

Melinda Ruth Burke

Attorney at Martin, Disiere, Jefferson & Wisdom, LLP

9111 Cypress Waters Blvd., Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75019

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Conditional DISMISSAL. Having been advised the parties have settled, this case is dismissed with prejudice #5 . By 1/10/2020, the parties may move for reinstatement. Case terminated on 11/20/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Agreed MOTION for to Enter Judgment by Fred Fricks, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Collins, Wayne) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Order: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Burke, Melinda) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 113th Judicial District, Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-67597 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23377139) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Burke, Melinda) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Conditional DISMISSAL. Having been advised the parties have settled, this case is dismissed with prejudice #5 . By 1/10/2020, the parties may move for reinstatement. Case terminated on 11/20/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Agreed MOTION for to Enter Judgment by Fred Fricks, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Collins, Wayne) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Burke, Melinda) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 113th Judicial District, Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-67597 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23377139) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Burke, Melinda) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less