This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2020 at 07:26:12 (UTC).

Freyer et al v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Freyer filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Frontier Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03468

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandy Beck

Randi Freyer

Shannon Kiedrowski

Erin Zielinski

Defendant

Frontier Airlines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lani A. Perlman

Galen Leigh Sherwin

Jayme Jonat

Sara R. Neel

Vincent Gregory Levy

Mark Silverstein

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Ashley Webber

Danielle L. Kitson

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

8 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#10

#11

#12

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 2/20/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/8/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shannon Kiedrowski, Randi Freyer, Erin Zielinski, Brandy Beck. Frontier Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Perlman, Lani) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:r e: #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Erin Webber. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (evana, ) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Danielle L. Kitson by Danielle L. Kitson on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Erin A. Webber by Danielle L. Kitson on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc.Attorney Danielle L. Kitson added to party Frontier Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Mark Silverstein by Mark Silverstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Brandy Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Randi Freyer(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Shannon Kiedrowski(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Erin Zielinski(pty:pla) (Silverstein, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/11/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Galen Leigh Sherwin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Galen Leigh Sherwin added to party Brandy Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Galen Leigh Sherwin added to party Randi Freyer(pty:pla), Attorney Galen Leigh Sherwin added to party Shannon Kiedrowski(pty:pla), Attorney Galen Leigh Sherwin added to party Erin Zielinski(pty:pla) (Sherwin, Galen) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lani A. Perlman on behalf of Brandy Beck, Randi Freyer, Shannon Kiedrowski, Erin ZielinskiAttorney Lani A. Perlman added to party Brandy Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Lani A. Perlman added to party Randi Freyer(pty:pla), Attorney Lani A. Perlman added to party Shannon Kiedrowski(pty:pla), Attorney Lani A. Perlman added to party Erin Zielinski(pty:pla) (Perlman, Lani) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Vincent Gregory Levy on behalf of Brandy Beck, Randi Freyer, Shannon Kiedrowski, Erin ZielinskiAttorney Vincent Gregory Levy added to party Brandy Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Vincent Gregory Levy added to party Randi Freyer(pty:pla), Attorney Vincent Gregory Levy added to party Shannon Kiedrowski(pty:pla), Attorney Vincent Gregory Levy added to party Erin Zielinski(pty:pla) (Levy, Vincent) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jayme Jonat on behalf of Brandy Beck, Randi Freyer, Shannon Kiedrowski, Erin ZielinskiAttorney Jayme Jonat added to party Brandy Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Jayme Jonat added to party Randi Freyer(pty:pla), Attorney Jayme Jonat added to party Shannon Kiedrowski(pty:pla), Attorney Jayme Jonat added to party Erin Zielinski(pty:pla) (Jonat, Jayme) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Sara R. Neel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neel, Sara) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7036725)Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Brandy Beck(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Randi Freyer(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Shannon Kiedrowski(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Erin Zielinski(pty:pla), filed by Shannon Kiedrowski, Randi Freyer, Erin Zielinski, Brandy Beck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Neel, Sara) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less