This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:50:38 (UTC).

FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against ALEX M AZAR II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03536

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC

BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC.

SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS)

SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES

BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION

BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION

BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL

ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC

JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL

GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER

TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC

LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.

AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC

MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC

AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Roth

Attorney at HOOPER LUNDY & BOOKMAN, PC

401 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 550

Washington, DC 20004

Other Attorneys

Liam Holland

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw, Room 11318

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#6

#5

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

#3

#2

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Liam Holland on behalf of All Defendants (Holland, Liam) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General December 4, 2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/3/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/3/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/2/2020.) (Roth, Robert) Modified date served on 1/2/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC, BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-867. (Roth, Robert) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC, BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER (Roth, Robert) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6589149) filed by AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Roth, Robert) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC is a litigant