This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:51:51 (UTC).

Fresh Inc v. Transportation Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Fresh Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transportation Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan, Christine D Little and Gregory K Frizzell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine D Little

Presiding Judges

Claire V Eagan

Gregory K Frizzell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Fresh Inc

All Fresh Corporation

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Transportation Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Hugh Michael Robert

Attorney at Sherwood, McCormick & Robert

15 W. 6Th St., Ste. 2800

Tulsa, OK 74119

Patrick Francis Collogan

Attorney at Biby Law Firm

1646 S. Denver Ave.

Tulsa, OK 74119

Donald Eugene Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Hunter Keith Bailey

Attorney at Smolen Law

611 S. Detroit Ave.

Tulsa, OK 74120

James David Sicking, Jr

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 South Detroit Avenue

Tulsa, OK 74120

Laura L Hamilton

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew Charles Jayne

Attorney at Baum Glass Jayne Carwile & Peters PLLC

401 S. Boston Avenue, Ste 2000

Tulsa, OK 74103

Tara Dawn Zickefoose

Attorney at Baum Glass Jayne Carwile & Peters

401 S. Boston Ave., Suite 2000

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Hugh M. Robert, Patrick F. Collogan and Jacob W. Biby by Fresh Inc (Collogan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#24

(#24) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Transportation Insurance Company (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#23

(#23) ANSWER (Re: #11 Counterclaim ) by Fresh Inc (Bailey, Hunter) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#22

(#22) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James David Sicking, Jr on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney James David Sicking, Jr added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney James David Sicking, Jr added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Sicking, James) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#21

(#21) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hunter Keith Bailey on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Hunter Keith Bailey added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Keith Bailey added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Bailey, Hunter) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#20

(#20) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#19

(#19) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Hamilton, Laura) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#18

(#18) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#11

(#23) ANSWER (Re: #11 Counterclaim ) by Fresh Inc (Bailey, Hunter) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick Francis Collogan on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Patrick Francis Collogan added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla).] (Collogan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

2 #6

Exhibit 6. OSCN Docket Sheet

2 #5

Exhibit 5. Summons ROS CNAF

2 #4

Exhibit 4. Summons ROS CCC

2 #3

Exhibit 3. DWOP

2 #2

Exhibit 2. Summons ROS Transportation

2 #1

Exhibit 1. Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2021-03696 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2548407) by Transportation Insurance Company (With attachments) (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Transportation Insurance Company (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting request to withdraw Hugh M. Robert and Patrick F. Collogan. Jacob W. Biby has never entered his appearance in the case. ; terminating attorney Patrick Francis Collogan and Hugh Michael Robert ; granting in part #26 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Hugh M. Robert, Patrick F. Collogan and Jacob W. Biby by Fresh Inc (Collogan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Judge Claire V Eagan. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 22-cv-38-GKF-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Transportation Insurance Company (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER (Re: #11 Counterclaim ) by Fresh Inc (Bailey, Hunter) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James David Sicking, Jr on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney James David Sicking, Jr added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney James David Sicking, Jr added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Sicking, James) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hunter Keith Bailey on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Hunter Keith Bailey added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Keith Bailey added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Bailey, Hunter) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Hamilton, Laura) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Fresh Inc(pty:cd).] (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for Transportation Insurance Company) by Transportation Insurance Company (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Andrew C. Jayne by Transportation Insurance Company (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JURY DEMAND by Transportation Insurance Company (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tara Dawn Zickefoose on behalf of Transportation Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Tara Dawn Zickefoose added to party Transportation Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Zickefoose, Tara) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Fresh Inc and Transportation Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Charles Jayne on behalf of Transportation Insurance Company (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick Francis Collogan on behalf of Fresh Inc [Note: Attorney Patrick Francis Collogan added to party Fresh Inc(pty:pla).] (Collogan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2021-03696 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2548407) by Transportation Insurance Company (With attachments) (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Transportation Insurance Company (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Fresh Inc (bjb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRESH INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara Dawn Zickefoose

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Charles Jayne