This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:19:51 (UTC).

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. v. Piccillo et al

Case Summary

On October 28, 2021, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. dba Fresenius Medical Care North America (“FMCNA” or “Plaintiff”) represented by Joe Merschman of Wiggin and Dana LLP, filed a contract lawsuit against James J. Piccillo (“Piccillo”) and MIH CP Solutions, LLC (“MIH CP”) (together, “Defendants”). Plaintiff filed suit seeking compensatory relief along with prejudgment and post-judgment interest, costs, expenses, and attorneys’ fees for Defendants’ alleged failure to deliver any of the 3M masks that FMCNA ordered, in breach of their obligations and duties. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the District of Massachusetts with Judge Allison D. Burroughs presiding. 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “In April 2020, FMCNA issued two purchase orders to James J. Piccillo dba MIH CP Solutions LLC. On or about April 6, 2020, FMCNA issued Purchase Order 4511025142 to James J. Piccillo dba MIH CP Solutions LLC (the “Global PO”).” “On or about April 17, 2020, FMCNA issued another purchase order, Purchase Order 4511030385, to James J. Piccillo dba MIH CP Solutions LLC (the “Hot Zone PO”).”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Unbeknownst to FMCNA, Piccillo dba MIH CP Solutions LLC had entered into a written Joint Venture Agreement dated March 19, 2020 (the “Joint Venture”), with Jian Tam dba Made In Brooklyn Designs Inc. (“MIBD”). Upon information and belief, Piccillo assigned the Global PO to the Joint Venture, and he did so without FMCNA’s knowledge or consent.” “In breach of their obligations and duties to FMCNA, Piccillo and MIH CP failed to deliver any of the 3M masks that FMCNA had ordered.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “In summary, FMCNA wired a total of $2,405,000.00 to Piccillo as deposits for the Global PO and Hot Zone PO. Piccillo and MIH CP failed to deliver the 3M N95 particulate respirators as required, FMCNA cancelled both purchase orders in accordance with the agreed upon Terms and Conditions, and Piccillo has failed to return all of FMCNA’s deposits. To date, FMCNA has recovered a total of only $535,000.00.”

Plaintiff lists out five claims for relief. The first two claims are against both Defendants for breach of contracts. The third claim is against only Piccillo for unjust enrichment. The fourth claim is against both Defendants for the violation of chapter 93A, and the fifth claim is also against only Piccillo for the money had and received.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested the court to award compensatory damages, reasonable attorneys’ fees, and costs pursuant to Count I and II. Plaintiff requested the court for the recovery of amounts wrongfully retained by Piccillo and/or his agents pursuant to Count III. Plaintiff requested compensatory damages, treble damages, reasonable attorneys’ fees, and costs pursuant to Count IV, and the recovery of amounts unjustly retained by Piccillo and/or his agents pursuant to Count V. Plaintiff further requested for pre-judgment interest, post-judgment interest, all reasonable costs and expenses. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11761

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.

Defendants

James J. Piccillo

MIH CP Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joe Merschman

 

Court Documents

11 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Default Judgment

11 #2

Affidavit of Non-Military Service with Exhibit

11 #1

Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) Return receipt received for mail sent to MIH CP Solutions LLC Delivered on 12/10/2021 (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#9

(#9) Return receipt received for mail sent to James J. Piccillo Delivered on 12/10/2021 (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#8

(#8) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MIH CP Solutions LLC, James J. Piccillo (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

6 #1

Affidavit in Support of Request for Default

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. James J. Piccillo served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. Acknowledgement filed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Merschman, Joe) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. MIH CP Solutions LLC served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. Acknowledgement filed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Merschman, Joe) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MIH CP Solutions LLC, James J. Piccillo. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #4

Summons re MIH CP Solutions LLC

1 #3

Summons re J. Piccillo

1 #2

Civil Category Sheet

9 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, #2 Affidavit of Non-Military Service with Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Default Judgment)(Merschman, Joe) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return receipt received for mail sent to MIH CP Solutions LLC Delivered on 12/10/2021 (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return receipt received for mail sent to James J. Piccillo Delivered on 12/10/2021 (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MIH CP Solutions LLC, James J. Piccillo (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for notice of default by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Default)(Merschman, Joe) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. James J. Piccillo served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. Acknowledgement filed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Merschman, Joe) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. MIH CP Solutions LLC served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. Acknowledgement filed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Merschman, Joe) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to MIH CP Solutions LLC, James J. Piccillo. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MIH CP Solutions LLC, James J. Piccillo Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9032247 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet, #3 Summons re J. Piccillo, #4 Summons re MIH CP Solutions LLC)(Merschman, Joe) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less