This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2021 at 09:02:34 (UTC).

French et al v. Davenport Agency, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 French filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Davenport Agency, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01079

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gary E. French

Mid-State Movers, LLC

Defendants

Penn Star Insurance Company

Davenport Agency, Inc.

Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company

Gary W. Davenport

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Jay Mendelsohn

Attorney at Jemison & Mendelsohn

1772 Platt Place

Montgomery, AL 36117

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Sommerville Given

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

420 North Twentieth Street; Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Kermit LaGuin Kendrick

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

420 North Twentieth Street, Suite 3400 Wells Fargo Tower

Birmingham, AL 35203

Robert Moore Ronnlund

Attorney at Scott Sullivan Streetman & Fox, PC

2450 Valleydale Road

Birmingham, AL 35244

John Stephen Johnson

Attorney at Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC

1801 5Th Avenue North; Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35203

James Stanley Witcher, III

Attorney at Hand Arendall, LLC

1801 5Th Avenue North; Suite 400, Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

#14

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

#11

#10

#9

1 #12

Corrected Signature Page to Exhibit 6, Consent to Removal

1 #11

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

State Court Complaint, Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, 03-CV-2020-90141

1 #8

Exhibit 8, Redacted Sales Agreement

1 #7

Exhibit 7, Settlement Demand

1 #6

Exhibit 6, Consent to Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER directing that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, but not later than 3/15/2021, as further set out in order; the parties must confirm their decision to consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge in writing and shall complete the appropriate attached form and return to the clerk on or before 3/15/2021, as further set out in order; Do not electronically file this document. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/22/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Penn Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Given, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint for Damages and Declaratory Judgment by Penn Star Insurance Company.(Given, Robert) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Penn Star Insurance Company's unopposed Motion for Leave to File Answer out of time (Doc. #12 ) and its proposed answer (Doc. #12 -1), and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #12 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its answer on or before 2/25/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/18/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Attorney Kermit LaGuin Kendrick added for Penn Star Insurance Company. (dmn, ) (see Doc. #12 for pdf) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Answer by Penn Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Given, Robert) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Witcher, James) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gary W. Davenport, Davenport Agency, Inc., Gary E. French, Mid-State Movers, LLC. (dmn, ) (no pdf see Doc. #1 and Doc. #5 ; erroneously removed jury demands when answer was filed) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Witcher, James) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company.(Witcher, James) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gary W. Davenport, Davenport Agency, Inc.. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gary E. French, Mid-State Movers, LLC. (Mendelsohn, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gary E. French, Mid-State Movers, LLC. (Mendelsohn, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gary W. Davenport, Davenport Agency, Inc..(Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #3 ), and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline for filing a responsive pleading and corporate conflict disclosure statement is hereby extended 14 days. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/7/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Johnson, John) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, Gary W. Davenport, Davenport Agency, Inc., Gary E. French, Mid-State Movers, LLC. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gary E. French, Mid-State Movers, LLC. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 for pdf) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, Gary W. Davenport, Davenport Agency, Inc., Penn Star Insurance Company, filed by Gary E. French, Mid-State Movers, LLC.(dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 for pdf) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, Case number 03-CV-2020-901419.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602060741) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, State Court Complaint 46-CV2019-900180.00, Circuit Court Macon County, AL, #5 Exhibit 5, Declaration of Aaron McGoldrick, #6 Exhibit 6, Consent to Removal, #7 Exhibit 7, Settlement Demand, #8 Exhibit 8, Redacted Sales Agreement, #9 State Court Complaint, Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, 03-CV-2020-901419.00, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2021: #12 Corrected Signature Page to Exhibit 6, Consent to Removal) (dmn, ). (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Penn-Star Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Jay Mendelsohn