This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:35:50 (UTC).

Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Fremont Emergency Services Mandavia , Ltd filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00832

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.

Defendants

Sierra Health Care Options, Inc.

United Healthcare Insurance Company

Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc.

UMR, Inc.

United Health Care Services Inc.

Oxford Health Plans, Inc.

Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc.

UMR, Inc. doing business as United Medical Resources

United Health Care Services Inc. doing business as United Healthcare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patricia K Lundvall

Attorney at McDonald Carano Wilson LLP

2300 W. Sahara Ave., Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Amanda M. Perach

Attorney at McDonald Carano Wilson, LLP

2300 West Sahara Ave., Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Kristen T. Gallagher

Attorney at McDonald Carano Wilson LLP

2300 W Sahara Avenue, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant Attorneys

Colby Balkenbush

Attorney at Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial, LLC

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Josephine Groh

Attorney at Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89118

D. Lee Roberts, Jr

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89118

 

Court Documents

#28

26 #2

Exhibit B

26 #1

Exhibit A

#26

#25

22 #2

Exhibit

22 #1

Exhibit

#22

#14

4 #5

Exhibit

4 #2

Exhibit

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Balkenbush, Colby) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/1/2019. Re #22 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply #22 is GRANTED. The deadline for the reply in support of the motion to dismiss #4 is extended to July 2, 2019.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Perach, Amanda) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER denying #14 Motion to Stay Case; Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY to Response to #14 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Gallagher, Kristen) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #22 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Balkenbush, Colby) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. Replies due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Balkenbush, Colby) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. Replies due by 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Balkenbush, Colby) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. Replies due by 6/25/2019. (Perach, Amanda) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to #8 Statement in Removal Case, by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gallagher, Kristen) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Balkenbush, Colby) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gallagher, Kristen) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Balkenbush, Colby) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen T. Gallagher, Esq.) (Gallagher, Kristen) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Balkenbush, Colby) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/15/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/30/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Roberts, D.) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-792978-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5548762) by Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., UMR, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, D.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH PLAN OF NEVADA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd. is a litigant