This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2021 at 08:23:33 (UTC).

Fremgen et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Fremgen filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra C. Freeman and Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00351

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra C. Freeman

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary Christopherson-Juve

Denise DeLeon

Shannon Fremgen

Michael Wilder

Sandra Wilde

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc.

HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.

Hachette Book Group, Inc.

Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC

Simon & Schuster, Inc.

Penguin Random House LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaniel A. Tarnor

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

322 8Th Avenue, Suite 802

New York, NY 10001

Paul Ethan Slater

Attorney at Sperling & Slater, P.C. (IL)

55 West Monroe St. Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Matthew Trace Slater

Attorney at Sperling & Slater, P.C. (IL)

55 West Monroe St. Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Barbara Mahoney

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Eamon P. Kelly

Attorney at Sperling & Slater PC

55 W Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (Seattle)

1301 Second Ave., Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Joseph M Vanek

Attorney at Sperling & Slater, P.C.

55 W. Monroe St., Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Bradley Pitt

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP (DC)

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Charles Scott Lent

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP (NYC)

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Joel M. Mitnick

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10281

Robert Michael Swenson

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Jeffrey Leonard White

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP

1300 Eye St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Yehudah Lev Buchweitz

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Margaret Anne Rogers

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP (NYC)

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Saul P Morgenstern

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#53

#41

#51

#50

#49

#48

#47

#46

#45

#44

#43

#40

#39

#38

#37

#35

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER: While Hagens Berman's request for appointment is currently unopposed, the Court wishes to provide an opportunity for interested persons to state their objection, if any, to such appointment. Accordingly, is HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to the appointment of Hagens Berman as interim lead counsel in the above-captioned actions shall be due no later than seven days after the entry of this order; any reply to such opposition shall be due no later than four days after the filing and service of the opposition. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/8/2021) (mro) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Eamon Padraic Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24219992. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION for Eamon Padraic Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24219992. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kelly, Eamon) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Georg von Holtzbrinck GmbH & Co. KG for Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC. Document filed by Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Mitnick on behalf of Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Swenson on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Swenson, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Leonard White on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(White, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Document filed by Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yehudah Lev Buchweitz on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bertelsmann SE & Co. KGaA for Penguin Random House LLC. Document filed by Penguin Random House LLC..(Morgenstern, Saul) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. Document filed by Shannon Fremgen; Denise DeLeon; Mary Christopherson-Juve..(Tarnor, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/17/2021) (mro) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.com, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nathaniel A. Tarnor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shannon Fremgen, Denise DeLeon, Mary Christopherson-Juve. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen..(Tarnor, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tarnor, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23517168)Document filed by Shannon Fremgen, Denise DeLeon, Mary Christopherson-Juve..(Tarnor, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Penguin Random House LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hachette Book Group USA Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC is a litigant