This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:17:49 (UTC).

Freitas et al v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Freitas filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are George A. OToole, Jr and Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12470

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

George A. OToole, Jr

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joao Sakai Freitas

Aline Freitas

Defendant

Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Diane K. Nordbye

Attorney at Shapiro Law Group, PC

300 Trade Center, Suite 3700

Woburn, MA 01801

Anna Shapiro

Attorney at Shapiro Law Group

300 Trade Center, Suite 3700

Woburn, MA 01801

Defendant Attorneys

Cheryl B. Pinarchick

Attorney at Fisher Phillips

Floor 7, 200 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Monica P. Snyder

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP

200 State Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8002462 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Category Sheet)(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Category Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Monica P. Snyder on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC (Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl B. Pinarchick on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC (Pinarchick, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

5 #4

Exhibit 4

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#22

(#22) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re #21 MOTION for Leave to Allow David Brier to Appear by Telephone at February 25, 2020. "Allowed." Deputy Clerk to provide courtroom information prior to hearing. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#21

(#21) Assented to MOTION Leave to Allow David Brier to Appear by Telephone at February 25, 2020 Conference by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC.(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss ERISA Claim in Count VI of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

19 #2

Exhibit 2

19 #1

Exhibit 1

18 #1

Exhibit 1

18 #2

Exhibit 2

#19

(#19) MOTION to Compel Arbitration of All Claims Except the ERISA Claim in Count VI of the Amended Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION for Order to Allowing Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint and Establishing Filing of Responsive Pleading by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC.(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered re #21 MOTION for Leave to Allow David Brier to Appear by Telephone at February 25, 2020. "Allowed." Deputy Clerk to provide courtroom information prior to hearing. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Assented to MOTION Leave to Allow David Brier to Appear by Telephone at February 25, 2020 Conference by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC.(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on re #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of All Claims Except the ERISA Claim in Count VI of the Amended Complaint, #18 MOTION to Dismiss ERISA Claim in Count VI of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Compel Arbitration of All Claims Except the ERISA Claim in Count VI of the Amended Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss ERISA Claim in Count VI of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #5 Motion to Compel; granting #10 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting #16 Motion for Order. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION for Order to Allowing Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint and Establishing Filing of Responsive Pleading by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC.(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #10 First MOTION to Amend #9 Amended Complaint , #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Count VI of Plaintiffs' Complaint.... Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference... Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION to Amend #9 Amended Complaint by Aline Freitas, Joao Sakai Freitas.(Shapiro, Anna) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, filed by Aline Freitas, Joao Sakai Freitas.(Shapiro, Anna) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT Record Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC summons served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019.. (Pinarchick, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#7) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Count VI of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl B. Pinarchick on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC (Pinarchick, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Monica P. Snyder on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC (Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8002462 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Category Sheet)(Snyder, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less