This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 08:37:58 (UTC).

Fregoso v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Fregoso filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00367

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guadalupe Fregoso

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce D. Tingey

Attorney at Tingey & Tingey

2001 W. Charleston Blvd.

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant Attorneys

Myraleigh Alberto

Attorney at RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C.

8925 West Russell Road, Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Troy Clark

Attorney at Resnick & Lewis, P.C.

8925 West Russell Road Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit Approval to Affix Signature

#8

(#8) STIPULATION and Order to Cap Plaintiff's Damages and Remand by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Approval to Affix Signature) (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/4/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/19/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

1 #7

Exhibit Allstate's Answer

1 #6

Exhibit Allstate's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure

1 #5

Exhibit Allstate's Demand for Jury Trial

1 #4

Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Allstat

1 #3

Exhibit Fregoso's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-829370-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6392252) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Fregoso's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Allstat, #5 Exhibit Allstate's Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Exhibit Allstate's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #7 Exhibit Allstate's Answer) (Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/04/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/8/2021. The Court construes the #8 Stipulation as an admission that when Defendant Allstates #1 Petition for Removal was filed, the amount in controversy in the matter did not exceed $75,000.00 and this Court had no subject matter jurisdiction. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that #8 is Granted and the Court remands this case back to the Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case A-21-829370-C. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION and Order to Cap Plaintiff's Damages and Remand by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Approval to Affix Signature) (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) FIRST NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IA 11-1: The court has no record that Myraleigh Alberto has been admitted to the bar of this court. Attorney is advised to comply with the admission requirements of this Court. Admission forms are available on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Bruce D. Tingey is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/4/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/19/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-829370-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6392252) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Fregoso's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Allstat, #5 Exhibit Allstate's Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Exhibit Allstate's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #7 Exhibit Allstate's Answer) (Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce D. Tingey