This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:51 (UTC).

Freeman v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Freeman filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and G. Kendall Sharp. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02293

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

G. Kendall Sharp

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Austin Dakota Freeman

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Respondents

Attorney General, State of Florida

Secretary, Department of Corrections

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court, Middle District of Florida, Ocala Division for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/17/2019. (SC) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -State- filed by Austin Dakota Freeman. (Filing fee not paid. IFP Motion not filed).(DMA) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) AMENDED PETITION by a State prisoner for writ of habeas corpus filed by Austin Dakota Freeman.(DMA) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Austin Dakota Freeman. Related case(s): no (DMA) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/6/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • Docket(#6) TRANSFER to Ocala Division and assigned case number 5:19-cv-00633-MMH-PRL (DMA) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court, Middle District of Florida, Ocala Division for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/17/2019. (SC) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Austin Dakota Freeman. Related case(s): no (DMA) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED PETITION by a State prisoner for writ of habeas corpus filed by Austin Dakota Freeman.(DMA) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/6/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -State- filed by Austin Dakota Freeman. (Filing fee not paid. IFP Motion not filed).(DMA) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.