This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2020 at 10:44:00 (UTC).

Freeman et al v. Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Freeman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00505

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ashton Freeman

Nathan Freeman

Defendants

Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc.

Guy Cantwell

Paddack Wrecker Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Lewis Williams

Attorney at Larry R. Williams, PLLC

315 Deaderick Street, Suite 1510, P O Box 190632

Nashville, TN 37219-0632

Matthew McGill

Attorney at Lowder & McGill, PLLC

537 E. 10Th Avenue, Suite 100, Post Office Box 900

Bowling Green, KY 42102

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S. Holder

Attorney at Leitner, Williams, Dooley, and Napolitan (Nashville)

4Th & Church Building, 201 4Th Avenue North, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

Mary Beth White

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500, P.O. Box 198615

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#18

#17

#16

12 #4

Attachment Proposed Order

12 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Matthew McGill

12 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2-Certificate of Good Standing from the US District Court, Weste

#12

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notices to Plaintiffs' Attorney and State Court Clerk

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial is set for 2/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 1/24/2022. Witness List due by 1/24/2022. Pretrial Conference is set for 1/31/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A859 before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 12/31/2020. Discovery due by 4/5/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/3/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 8/4/2020. (Hearing lasted 00:19)(sd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/4/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: The initial case management conference set on August 4, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., will be held by telephone. Counsel shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on July 28, 2020. (AN) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (INITIAL) filed by Ashton Freeman, Nathan Freeman. (Williams, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc., Paddack Wrecker Service, Inc. re #16 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Paddack Wrecker Service, Inc., Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#16 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal filed by Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc., Paddack Wrecker Service, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Matthew McGill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court Vicki R. Kinkade on 7/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (dt). Modified on 7/13/2020 (dt). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Paddack Wrecker Service, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal filed by Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc., Paddack Wrecker Service, Inc. . (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal by Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc., Paddack Wrecker Service, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Guy Cantwell.(White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/18/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Beth White, Michael S. Holder and Jonathan Lewis Williams. (dt) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Guy Cantwell, Paddack Heavy Transport, Inc. and Paddack Wrecker Service, Inc. from Circuit Court for Sumner County, Tennessee, case number 83CC1-2020-CV-419. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-3159715) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notices to Plaintiffs' Attorney and State Court Clerk, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Beth White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Holder