This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2019 at 08:50:36 (UTC).

Freedom Northwest Credit Union v. National Credit Union Administration

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Freedom Northwest Credit Union filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against National Credit Union Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00351

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freedom Northwest Credit Union

Defendant

National Credit Union Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel Toevs Creason

Attorney at Creason, Moore, Dokken & Geidl, PLLC

Po Drawer 835

Lewiston, ID 83501

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas J Woychick

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

800 Park Blvd #600

Boise, ID 83712

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by National Credit Union Administration. (Woychick, Nicholas)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Northwest Credit Union. (Creason, Samuel)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to National Credit Union Administration. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1938762.), filed by FREEDOM NORTHWEST CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Creason, Samuel)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. The stipulation filed by the parties in this case (Dkt. #4 ) is hereby APPROVED. Defendant shall have until November 8, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by National Credit Union Administration. (Woychick, Nicholas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Northwest Credit Union. (Creason, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to National Credit Union Administration. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1938762.), filed by FREEDOM NORTHWEST CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Creason, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less