This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:27:38 (UTC).

Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Martin et. al.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Freedom Mortgage Corporation filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Martin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary R. Brown and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00090

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary R. Brown

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freedom Mortgage Corporation

Defendants

Inefta M. Reid

Kevon Martin

Inefta Reid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas John Bebirian

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

1775 Wehrle Drive, Ste. 100

Williamsville, NY 14221

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Freedom Mortgage Corporation Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Inefta M. Reid served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kevon Martin, Inefta M. Reid filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12220132 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for all Defendants, #3 Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CPLR 3012-B) (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Kevon Martin served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons for all Defendants

1 #3

Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CPLR 3012-B

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Kevon Martin, Inefta M. Reid. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE - In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (DE #9 ), this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to its reinstatement. Barring any further requests for an extension within 90 days of this order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/18/2020. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Freedom Mortgage Corporation Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Kevon Martin served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Inefta M. Reid served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Kevon Martin, Inefta M. Reid. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kevon Martin, Inefta M. Reid filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12220132 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for all Defendants, #3 Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CPLR 3012-B) (Bebirian, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.