This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:37:27 (UTC).

Fredricksen et al v. Allstate Indemnity

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Fredricksen filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Indemnity. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00655

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amy N. Fredricksen

Jerry S. Fredricksen

Defendant

Allstate Indemnity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Nord

Attorney at SAGE LAW PARTNERS LLC

140 N Union Ave Ste 220

Farmington, UT 84025

Defendant Attorneys

Mark L. Anderson

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Alan Keith Beal

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samantha E. Wilcox

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Allstate Indemnity, Plaintiffs Amy N. Fredricksen, Jerry S. Fredricksen per #9 Report of Attorney Planning Meeting. (mh) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2021. Expert Discovery due by 8/24/2022. Dispositive or Potentially Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/10/21. (dla) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order

#9

(#9) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Nord, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

7 #5

Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification

7 #4

Notice of Removal

7 #3

Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification

7 #2

Notice of Service

7 #1

Complaint

#7

(#7) File downloaded from Fourth District Utah County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Service, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Indemnity, Plaintiffs Amy N. Fredricksen, Jerry S. Fredricksen. Form due by 11/18/2021. (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Indemnity, Plaintiffs Amy N. Fredricksen, Jerry S. Fredricksen. (mh) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Indemnity identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Indemnity.(Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

2 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th District, Utah County, case number 210401445, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4154537) filed by Allstate Indemnity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Allstate Indemnity, Plaintiffs Amy N. Fredricksen, Jerry S. Fredricksen per #9 Report of Attorney Planning Meeting. (mh) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2021. Expert Discovery due by 8/24/2022. Dispositive or Potentially Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/10/21. (dla) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Nord, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#8) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Amy N. Fredricksen, Jerry S. Fredricksen. (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) File downloaded from Fourth District Utah County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Service, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Indemnity, Plaintiffs Amy N. Fredricksen, Jerry S. Fredricksen. Form due by 11/18/2021. (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Indemnity, Plaintiffs Amy N. Fredricksen, Jerry S. Fredricksen. (mh) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Indemnity identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Indemnity.(Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th District, Utah County, case number 210401445, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4154537) filed by Allstate Indemnity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant Allstate Indemnity is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark L. Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha E. Wilcox